Delu v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Renee Delu
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01849
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Renee Delu: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon OGC on 12/14/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Renee Delu: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General on 12/15/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Renee Delu: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney on 12/13/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
December 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Karl E Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Renee Delu. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's #6 application to proceed without prepaying fees and costs is granted. Plaintiff is responsible for serving the summons and complaint. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/8/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Renee Delu. (Ayodele, Elizabeth)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff fails to submit the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Deputy Clerk. See document for details. (NKS)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01849-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Renee Delu. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Renee Delu. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delu v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Delu
Represented By: Elizabeth Oluwafunmi Ayodele
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?