Equity Recovery Specialists LLC v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Equity Recovery Specialists LLC
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, GSAA 2007-2, Unknown Parties and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01889
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Roberts, Daniel)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #13 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the first amended complaint is extended to December 29, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/16/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Certificate of Service re: #11 Amended Complaint /Certificate of Service re Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Equity Recovery Specialists LLC. (Kinney, Kyle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated filed by Equity Recovery Specialists LLC.(Kinney, Kyle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Equity Recovery Specialists LLC . (Kinney, Kyle)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #8 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to December 6, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/22/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Second Request by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Neumeyer, Coree)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. #5 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to November 29, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/15/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on February 8, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/15/21. (MAW)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Neumeyer, Coree)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20049398. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01889-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GSAA 2007-2. (Neumeyer, Coree) (SCA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Neumeyer, Coree) (SCA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinal County Superior Court, case number S1100CV202101927. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20049398 filed by GSAA 2007-2, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Neumeyer, Coree) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Consent to Removal)(SCA)
November 8, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent, Brooklyn Vandeventer, Service of Process Coordinator for Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated on 09/29/2021. (Original filed in Pinal County Superior Court on 10/04/2021). SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons; Verified Complaint-Declaratory Relief; Specific Performance; Quiet Title; Exhibits; Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Jane Doe, authorized to accept on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for GSAA 2007-2 on 10/07/2021. (Original filed in Pinal County Superior Court on 10/13/2021). (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equity Recovery Specialists LLC v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Recovery Specialists LLC
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSAA 2007-2
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?