Mendoza et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Mendoza, Rick Mendoza and Angelo Mendoza
Defendant: 3M Company, ABB Incorporated, Crown Holdings, Elliott Company, Flowserve Corporation, FMC Corporation, Honeywell International Incorporated, Mccord and Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Rockwell Automation Incorporated, Tate Andale LLC, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Viad Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, ITE Circuit Breaker Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated, Eaton Corporation, Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Ericsson Incorporated sued individually and as doing business as EUS Incorporated successor in interest Anaconda Wire and Cable Company successor in interest Continental Wire and Cable Company, Duriron Company Incorporated, Flowserve US Incorporated, Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Foster Wheller Energy Corporation, Fryer-Knowles Incorporated, General Electric Company, Gould Electronics Incorporated, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Allied-Signal Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mccord Corporation, McNally Industries Incorporated, Hookers Chemical Company, Pfizer Incorporated, Plastics Engingeering Company, Rockwell International Corporation, Rogers Corporation, Schneider Electric Engineering Services LLC, Siemens Energy & Automation Incorporated, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor Incorporated, Tate Tremco Incorporated, Tremco Machine Works Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, CBS Corporation, Viacom Incorporated, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Dial Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Atwood & Morrill, William Powell Company, Ericsson Incorporated sued individually and as successor-in-interest doing business as EUS Incorporated successor in interest Anaconda Wire and Cable Company successor in interest Continental Wire and Cable Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Schneider Electric USA Incorporated and SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv01911
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 Stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/7/2022. (KFZ)
January 7, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Daniel, David) Modified event on 1/7/2022 (KFZ).
January 7, 2022 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation for Eaton Corporation. (Fischer, C)
January 7, 2022 Filing 60 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Eaton Corporation.(Fischer, C)
January 7, 2022 Filing 59 ABB, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by ABB Incorporated.(Allin, Taylor)
January 6, 2022 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Incorporated for IMO Industries Incorporated. (Hendricks, John)
January 6, 2022 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Hendricks, John)
January 6, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Party Alfa Laval Incorporated (sued individually and as successor-in-interest) terminated. (Schulte, Steven)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #54 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Elliott Company shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/6/2022. (KFZ)
January 6, 2022 Filing 54 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Elliott Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hounfodji, Catherine) Modified on 1/7/2022 (WLP).
January 6, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine North Hounfodji on behalf of Elliott Company. (Hounfodji, Catherine)
January 6, 2022 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
January 6, 2022 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Viad Corporation.(Sparks, J)
January 6, 2022 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
January 6, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Incorporated.(Sparks, J)
January 6, 2022 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation. (Petri, Shawn)
January 6, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Petri, Shawn)
January 4, 2022 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rogers Corporation. (Hendricks, John)
January 4, 2022 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (Sixkiller, Laura)
January 4, 2022 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheller Energy Corporation. (Lite, Jeremy)
January 4, 2022 Filing 43 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheller Energy Corporation.(Lite, Jeremy)
January 3, 2022 Filing 42 DEFENDANT 3M COMPANYS ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT)(Sixkiller, Laura)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #40 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/2022. (KFZ)
January 3, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hounfodji, Catherine)
January 3, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine North Hounfodji on behalf of Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Hounfodji, Catherine)
January 3, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Rene Farnsworth on behalf of Mccord and Company. (Farnsworth, Madison)
January 3, 2022 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Lite, Jeremy)
January 3, 2022 Filing 36 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by General Electric Company.(Lite, Jeremy)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #34 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc., f/k/a/ Square D. Company, improperly named as Schneider Electric Engineering Services, LLC (sii to The Square D Company) shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/2022. (KFZ)
December 31, 2021 Filing 34 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint by Schneider Electric Engineering Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brinson, Jonathan)
December 31, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rogers Corporation.(Hendricks, John)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulations (Docs. #28 , #29 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation f/k/a Hookers Chemical Co. (sued as successor-in-interest to Durez Corporation and Defendant McCord Corporation shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before January 31, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/30/21. (SST)
December 30, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company identifying Corporate Parent William Powell Company for William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Shorall, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #11 Amended Complaint STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT MCCORD TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING (FIRST REQUEST by Mccord and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farnsworth, Madison)
December 29, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT or Otherwise Respond by Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Occidental Chemical Company)(Lemaster, John)
December 28, 2021 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Glavas, Tico)
December 28, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Glavas, Tico)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulations #21 , #22 , #23 , #24 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants FMC Corporation; Flowserve Corporation; McNally Industries, Inc.; and Hopeman Brothers, Inc. shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/28/2021. (KFZ)
December 28, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Hopeman Brothers Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
December 28, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by McNally Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
December 28, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #19 . FURTHER ORDERED that John Crane Inc. shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/28/2021. (KFZ)
December 28, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by John Crane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, James)
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gould Electronics Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Gould Electronics, Inc., Corporate Parent JX Holdings Inc. for Gould Electronics Incorporated. (Hazen, Scott)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 Gould Electronics Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gould Electronics Incorporated.(Hazen, Scott)
December 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P Hazen on behalf of Gould Electronics Incorporated. (Hazen, Scott)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time To Answer #13 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Pfizer, Inc. shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/2021. (KFZ)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Stipulation for Extension of Time To Answer #12 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Crane Company shall answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/2021. (KFZ)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Pfizer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 16, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott P Hazen on behalf of Defendant Gould Electronics Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulte, Steven) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule, attorney noticed on 12/7/2021 (LAD).
November 19, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Darren P McDowell on behalf of Plaintiffs Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Foster Wheller Energy Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schulte, Steven)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Rick Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Description of deficiency: Defendant names on summonses do not match docket and/or complaint. Please refile correct summonses for these two defendants. (BAS)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, ABB Incorporated, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crane Company, Crown Holdings, Eaton Corporation, Elliott Company, Ericsson Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Fryer-Knowles Incorporated, General Electric Company, Gould Electronics Incorporated, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, McNally Industries Incorporated, Mccord and Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Plastics Engingeering Company, Rockwell Automation Incorporated, Rogers Corporation, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor Incorporated, Schneider Electric Engineering Services LLC, Siemens Energy & Automation Incorporated, Tate Andale LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Viad Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons)(Schulte, Steven)
November 15, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven Scott Schulte on behalf of Plaintiffs Angelo Mendoza, Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiffs contend any further amendment of their Complaint (Doc. 1) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiffs must submit, no later than the time they file a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiffs could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 2/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/2021. (KFZ)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rick Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20061020. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1911-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20061020 filed by Rick Mendoza, Victoria Mendoza, Angelo Mendoza. (Schulte, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Incorporated
Represented By: Nicholas R Lane
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mccord and Company
Represented By: Kira Nicole Barrett
Represented By: Madison Rene Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: John C Lemaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITE Circuit Breaker Company
Represented By: Nicholas R Lane
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes Vulcan Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Briana Lynn Campbell
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Incorporated sued individually and as doing business as EUS Incorporated successor in interest Anaconda Wire and Cable Company successor in interest Continental Wire and Cable Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duriron Company Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Fire Apparatus Company
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheller Energy Corporation
Represented By: Cale Steven Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Cale Steven Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics Incorporated
Represented By: Lorraine Morey
Represented By: Scott P Hazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Incorporated
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Incorporated
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Leigh Gould
Represented By: Tico Anthony Glavas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mccord Corporation
Represented By: Kira Nicole Barrett
Represented By: Madison Rene Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hookers Chemical Company
Represented By: John C Lemaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engingeering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric Engineering Services LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Grant Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy & Automation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Tremco Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremco Machine Works Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Corporation
Represented By: Vincent Richard Miner
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Incorporated sued individually and as successor-in-interest doing business as EUS Incorporated successor in interest Anaconda Wire and Cable Company successor in interest Continental Wire and Cable Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Cale Steven Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan Grant Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Mendoza
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Darren P McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Mendoza
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Darren P McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Mendoza
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Darren P McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?