Martin v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Connie Martin
Defendant: General Motors LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv02086
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Stipulation #12 . FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for GM LLC to file its Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss to January 7, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/2021. (KFZ)
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order)(Fischer, C)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 *RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Connie Martin. (Urtuzuastegui, Joseph) *Modified to correct document linkage on 12/21/2021 (LAD).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #8 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before December 20, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/13/21. (SST)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Notice (Other) by Connie Martin. (Urtuzuastegui, Joseph)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by General Motors LLC. NOTE: Filed in State Court on 11/29/2021 and docketed in District Court pursuant to #6 Notice. (LAD)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Notice of General Motors LLC's Pending Motion to Dismiss by General Motors LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Fischer, C)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(d). FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a "Notice" of Pending Motion. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by General Motors LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20140291. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-02086-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C) (SCA)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-093832. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20140291 filed by General Motors LLC. (Fischer, C) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(SCA)
December 8, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Brooklyn Vanderventer, Statutory Agent at Coporation Service Company, for General Motors LLC on 11/10/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/12/2021) (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Martin
Represented By: Joseph Gregory Urtuzuastegui, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?