Murphy-Richardson #333262 v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson
Respondent: Arizona Department of Corrections, David Shinn, Attorney General of the State of Arizona, United States District Court for the District of Arizona, Arizona, State of and Superior Court of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2021cv02203
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson (1 page). (DXD)
February 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE filed by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (SMH) (2 pages, Titled as: Day v. McDonough)
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Circuit Rule 10(e) filed by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (SMH) (1 page)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 USCA Case Number re: #12 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-15179, Ninth Circuit. (BAC)
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. Reason for return: Defendant now resides in Florence Complex South Unit. Document numbers 11, 12, & 13. Note: Documents will be forwarded to new location, per email from SMU1. (SMH)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to file on a court-approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner and a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). (See Order for full details.) Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/12/22. (SST)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 OBJECTION re: #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other), #5 Order by Petitioner Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (6 pages plus envelope, document was received in the Northern District of California on 1/10/2022, in the District of Arizona on 1/27/2022). (WLP)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #3 Clerk's Notice, #4 Clerk's Notice, #5 Order by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (1 page plus envelope, document was received in the Northern District of California on 1/3/2022, in the District of Arizona on 1/28/2022). (WLP)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 OBJECTION re: #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other), #5 Order by Petitioner Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (2 pages plus envelope, document was received in the Northern District of California on 1/3/2022, in the District of Arizona on 1/28/2022). (WLP) Modified on 1/31/2022 (WLP).
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (REK)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 *NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (MAP) *Modified to regenerate NEF on 12/28/2021 (SCH).
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 *CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-09970 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. *Modified to regenerate the NEF on 12/28/2021 (SCH).
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred to District of Arizona. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/23/2021. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Petition on Form due by 1/31/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/31/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF Nature of Suit: 890 Other Statutory Relief by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION for Injunction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. Seeking Court Action within 24 Hours. Filed by Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson. Responses due by 1/20/2022. Replies due by 2/3/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy-Richardson #333262 v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ismael Antonio Murphy-Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States District Court for the District of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?