Delgadillo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Vanity Delgadillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00106
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Vanity Delgadillo: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (2/24/2022); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (2/22/2022); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (2/23/2022) on 2/24/2022; 2/22/2022; 2/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Fern, Sarah)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/1/22. (SJF)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/21/22. (SJF)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2), without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/20/22. (SJF)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-106-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Vanity Delgadillo. (Fern, Sarah) (ARC)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Vanity Delgadillo. (Fern, Sarah) (ARC)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vanity Delgadillo. (Fern, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgadillo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanity Delgadillo
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?