Howard v. Living Well Homes LLP et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Howard
Defendant: Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes GP Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated, Unknown Party and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2022cv00150
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Phillip Howard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Thornton, #2 Affidavit of Phillip Howard)(Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)
March 11, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 10, 2022 Filing 21 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 8, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexandra K Piazza on behalf of Plaintiff Phillip Howard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Daniel F. Thornton filed by Daniel Frederick Thornton. (Thornton, Daniel)
March 1, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes GP Incorporated. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes IV LP. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes III LP. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes II LP. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes LLP. (Shelts, Bradley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Living Well Homes LP. (Shelts, Bradley)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP Incorporated, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP, Unknown Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Shelts, Bradley)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP Incorporated, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/28/2022 to Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes GP Inc., Living Well Homes GP II Inc., Living Well Homes GP III Inc., Living Well Homes GP IV Inc. . (Shelts, Bradley) *Modified to correct filers on 2/28/2022 (REK).
February 16, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christine Gantt-Sorenson on behalf of Defendants Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP Incorporated, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 7, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shanon Jude Carson on behalf of Plaintiff Phillip Howard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 7, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Camille Fundora Rodriguez on behalf of Plaintiff Phillip Howard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 1, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel Frederick Thornton on behalf of Plaintiff Phillip Howard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Phillip Howard: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 1.28.22 to Matthew B. Levine on behalf of all Defendants . (Bonnett, Daniel)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated, Living Well Homes GP Incorporated, Living Well Homes II LP, Living Well Homes III LP, Living Well Homes IV LP, Living Well Homes LLP, Living Well Homes LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20283845. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00150-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Phillip Howard. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(SCA)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20283845 filed by Phillip Howard. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Living Well Homes LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Howard
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Daniel F Thornton
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Alexandra K Piazza
Represented By: Daniel Frederick Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes LLP
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes LP
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes II LP
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes III LP
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes IV LP
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes GP Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes GP II Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes GP III Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Well Homes GP IV Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Bradley Steven Shelts
Represented By: Christine Gantt-Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?