Stamper v. Freebird Logistics Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Stamper
Defendant: Freebird Logistics Incorporated, Jeffrey Larsen, Unknown Larsen and Kurt Larsen
Case Number: 2:2022cv00155
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Freebird Logistics, Inc. and Jeffrey Larsen by Gregory Stamper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, declaration of Gregory Stamper, #2 Exhibit B, text message from Defendant Jeffrey Larsen to Plaintiff, #3 Proposed Order granting motion)(Bendau, Christopher)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Freebird Logistics Incorporated, Jeffrey Larsen. (REK)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Gregory Stamper against Defendants Freebird Logistics, Inc. and Jeffrey Larsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Clifford P. Bendau, IIDeclaration of Nicole Maxie)(Bendau, Clifford)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 *Service Returned Unexecuted by Gregory Stamper: Summons and Complaint as to Unknown Larsen. (Bendau, Clifford) *Modified to correct event and text on 3/10/2022 (REK).
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gregory Stamper: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Jeffrey Larsen on 2/9/2022. (Bendau, Clifford)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gregory Stamper: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Freebird Logistics Inc. on 2/9/2022. (Bendau, Clifford)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/1/22. (SJF)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Freebird Logistics Incorporated, Jeffrey Larsen, Kurt Larsen, Unknown Larsen(named as Jane Doe Larsen II, a married couple), Unknown Larsen(named as Jane Doe Larsen, a married couple). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20287091. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-155-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gregory Stamper. (Bendau, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20287091 filed by Gregory Stamper. (Bendau, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamper v. Freebird Logistics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stamper
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freebird Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?