Anthony v. Rise Services Incorporated
Plaintiff: Deion Anthony
Defendant: Rise Services Incorporated an Arizona corporation and a Utah corporation doing business as Rise Incorporated, Rise Services Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Rise Incorporated and Rise Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00268
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Stipulation (Doc. #14 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until 4/20/2022, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/7/2022. (RMW)
April 6, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Rise Services Incorporated (an Arizona corporation), Rise Services Incorporated (a Utah corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Justin)
March 23, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rise Services Incorporated (an Arizona corporation), Rise Services Incorporated (a Utah corporation). (Pierce, Justin)
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to All Defendants. (RMW)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Stipulation (Doc. #10 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until 4/6/2022 to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/22/2022. (RMW)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Rise Services Incorporated (an Arizona corporation), Rise Services Incorporated (a Utah corporation). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Pierce, Justin)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Filing of Consent to Opt-in to Lawsuit (Sara Sanchez) by Deion Anthony . (Frankel, Ty)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Filing of Consent to Opt-in to Lawsuit (Jennifer Fischkelta) by Deion Anthony . (Frankel, Ty)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Deion Anthony: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Collective Action and Class Action Complaint with Ex. A (Consent to be Named Plaintiff and Opt-in (Deion Anthony)); Notice re Availability of Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order dated February 22, 2022 upon Rise Services Inc. (Utah) on 02/28/2022. (Frankel, Ty)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Deion Anthony: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Collective Action and Class Action Complaint with Ex. A (Consent to be Named Plaintiff and Opt-in (Deion Anthony)); Notice re Availability of Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order dated February 22, 2022 upon Rise Services, Inc. dba Rise, Inc. (Arizona) on 03/02/2022. (Frankel, Ty)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 5/19/2022. Plaintiff must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and unless the Court orders otherwise, on 5/19/2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 2/22/2022. (RMW)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rise Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20366247. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00268-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Deion Anthony. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20366247 filed by Deion Anthony. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. Rise Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deion Anthony
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Ty Derek Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Services Incorporated an Arizona corporation and a Utah corporation doing business as Rise Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Services Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Rise Incorporated
Represented By: Justin Scott Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Services Incorporated
Represented By: Justin Scott Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?