Foster v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ruth Foster
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00290
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Oum, Sathya)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Ruth Foster.(Fishman, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel Hersh Fishman on behalf of Plaintiff Ruth Foster. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY: Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/23/2022. (REK)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20376847. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00290-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ruth Foster. (Fishman, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20376847 filed by Ruth Foster. (Fishman, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Foster
Represented By: Daniel Hersh Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?