Marks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patricia Frances Marks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00326
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michonne Omo appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Omo, Michonne)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Frances Marks: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General on 3/22/22. SSA General Counsel on 3/19/22, Civil Process Clerk on 3/21/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence) *Modified to correct service dates on 3/22/2022 (WLP).
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
March 9, 2022 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 402.00 receipt number AAZDC-20430523. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (doc. #2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to pay the Court's filing fee to proceed. (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 3/7/22. (SST)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 2, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lawrence David Rohlfing on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Frances Marks. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00326-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Frances Marks. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) (BAC)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Patricia Frances Marks. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) (BAC)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Frances Marks. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of interested parties)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Frances Marks
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Michonne Louise Omo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?