Acosta v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Norma Diaz Acosta
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2022cv00349
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Krystle McMullan appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McMullan, Krystle)
March 25, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/23/2022. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/23/2022. (LFIG)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Norma Diaz Acosta. (Linerud, Rory)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case is before the Court on its own review. On March 7, 2022, the Court denied Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prejudice to refile because it was unsigned. (Doc. 5 ). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee or file a complete, signed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/9/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Norma Diaz Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Linerud, Rory)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 8, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rory J Linerud on behalf of Plaintiff Norma Diaz Acosta. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ). The Court notes that the Affidavit in Support of the Application is not signed. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED the Application (Doc. #2 ) is denied, without prejudice to renew. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/7/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00349-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Norma Diaz Acosta. (Linerud, Rory) (BAC)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Norma Diaz Acosta. (Linerud, Rory) (BAC)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Norma Diaz Acosta. (Linerud, Rory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Diaz Acosta
Represented By: Rory J Linerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Krystle Shenelle McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?