Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated v. Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Plaintiff: Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated
Defendant: Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00490
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 20 *Additional Attachment to Main Document re: #18 Second Moton for Extension of Time to File Answer corrupted file. by Defendant Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (Rocereta, Samuel) *Modified event and text on 5/26/2022 (REK).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Fusion Orthopedics, LLC may have up to and including June 20, 2022, in which to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Treace Medical Concepts, Inc.'s complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/17/22. (MAW)
May 17, 2022 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rocereta, Samuel)
May 17, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (Rocereta, Samuel)
May 17, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Douglas R Wilson, Michelle E Armond on behalf of Defendant Fusion Orthopedics LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant Fusion Orthopedics, LLC may have up to and including May 19, 2022, in which to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Treace Medical Concepts, Inc.'s complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/21/22. (MAW)
April 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Louis Rocereta on behalf of Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (Rocereta, Samuel)
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rocereta, Samuel)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Todd G Miller. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Vacant - Unable to Forward. Document number 11. (REK)
April 12, 2022 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Oliver J Richards. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Vacant - Unable to Forward. Document number 11. (REK)
April 6, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Todd G Miller, Oliver James Richards, Kelly Nicole Williams, Frank E Scherkenbach on behalf of Plaintiff Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 3, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-00490-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 1, 2022 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge upon Fusion Orthopedics, LLC on 3/30/2022. (Londen, Phillip)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated. (Londen, Phillip)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121 Form)(BAC)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20491904. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00490-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated. (Londen, Phillip) (BAC)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated. (Londen, Phillip) (BAC)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20491904 filed by Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated. (Londen, Phillip) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A-C, #4 Exhibit D-E, #5 Exhibit F-G, #6 Exhibit H-I, #7 Exhibit J-L)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated v. Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treace Medical Concepts Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Michael Fraser
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Oliver J Richards
Represented By: Phillip Winston Londen
Represented By: Todd G Miller
Represented By: Kelly Nicole Williams
Represented By: Oliver James Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Represented By: Douglas R Wilson
Represented By: Michelle E Armond
Represented By: Samuel Louis Rocereta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?