Johnson et al v. Secure Ventures LLC
Plaintiff: June Johnson and Carl Johnson
Defendant: Secure Ventures LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00568
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed May 12, 2022, judgment is hereby entered and this case is dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice. (SST)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that to the extent Doc. #26 seeks leave to file a second amended complaint, that request is denied because it is futile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this case for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice as to the merits of the case. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied for lack of jurisdiction. (See Order for details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/12/22. (SST)
May 2, 2022 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT re: #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (2 Pages) (REK)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time (Doc. #24 ) to file their supplement establishing federal subject matter jurisdiction is granted. Plaintiffs' supplement as required by this Court's 4/21/2022 order is due by 5/16/2022. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/2/2022. (RMW)
April 29, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement by Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (3 Pages) (REK)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that by 5/2/2022, Plaintiffs must file a supplement to the amended complaint properly pleading federal subject matter jurisdiction (this supplement shall not exceed 2 pages). If Plaintiffs fail to file this supplement, or if the supplement fails to plead a basis or federal subject matter jurisdiction, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. This will be Plaintiffs last opportunity to establish federal subject matter jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Second Amendment Complaint (captioned "Complaint (Supplement)") (Doc. #21 ) is stricken. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/21/2022. (RMW)
April 20, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re: #18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Carl Johnson. (SST) (6 pages)
April 20, 2022 Filing 21 STRICKEN by #23 : SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (SST) (19 pages) Modified on 4/21/2022 (RMW).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that by 4/27/2022, Plaintiffs must file a supplement to the amended complaint properly pleading federal subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs fail to file this supplement, or if the supplement fails to plead a basis for federal subject matter jurisdiction, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/18/2022. (RMW)
April 15, 2022 Filing 19 Revision of Documents Filed 4-7-2022 as Pro Se Litigants and Detailed Explanation of Errors within Documents and Their Corrections for Reconsideration Res Judicata filed by Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (SMH)
April 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (SMH)
April 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (SMH)
April 15, 2022 Filing 16 COMPLAINT (REVISED) against All Defendants filed by June Johnson, Carl Johnson. (SMH)
April 15, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Carl Johnson. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
April 15, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by June Johnson. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that by 4/27/2022, Plaintiffs must file a supplement to the complaint properly pleading federal subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs fail to file this supplement, or if the supplement fails to plead a basis for federal subject matter jurisdiction, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court will not consider Plaintiffs' application to proceed in forma pauperis until Plaintiffs establish jurisdiction. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/12/2022. (RMW)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STNDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - that Plaintiff must file a notice within 7 days of any Defendant answering (or, in a removed case, within 7 days of removal if any Defendant answered prior to removal) that the parties are ready for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. The Court will issue an order setting a Rule 16 conference. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/11/22. (MAP)
April 8, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Set Aside, MOTION Restrain Supplemental Judgment filed by Carl Johnson. (SMH) (8 pages)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Carl Johnson re: #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Carl Johnson. (SMH) (6 pages)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carl Johnson. (SMH) (6 pages)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a notice within 7 days of any Defendant answering (or, in a removed case, within 7 days of removal if any Defendant answered prior to removal) that the parties are ready for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. The Court will issue an order setting a Rule 16 conference. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/7/2022. (LAD)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the motion for temporary restraining order (Doc. #3 ) and motion for order to show cause (Doc. #4 ) are denied. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 4/7/2022. (RMW)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00568-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Carl Johnson and June Johnson. (BAS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with exhibits by Carl Johnson and June Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carl Johnson, June Johnson. (BAS)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested) filed by June Johnson, Carl Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Secure Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?