Poder Latinx v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Poder Latinx
Defendant: Katie Hobbs, Mark Brnovich and Stephen Richer
Case Number: 2:2022cv01003
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting (56 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) Motion to Transfer Related Case. All future filings in CV22-01003-PHX shall bear the case number CV22-01003-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/13/22. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01003-MTL) (DXD)
July 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Christine Bass. (Bass, Christine)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #10 ) by Stephen Richer [Maricopa County Recorder's Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer]. (Critz, Anna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 Joinder re: (56 in 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) MOTION to Transfer Related Case . filed by Katie Hobbs. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01003-MTL) (Gaona, David)
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 Maricopa County Recorder's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Richer.(Critz, Anna)
June 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christine Bass on behalf of Defendant Katie Hobbs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Griffin Critz on behalf of Stephen Richer. (Critz, Anna)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Poder Latinx. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-1003-PHX-MTL, CV-22-509-PHX-SRB, CV-22-519-PHX-SRB) (Sherman, Jon)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Poder Latinx: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/17/22 to Katie Hobbs . (Adelman, Daniel) *Modified to correct sent on date from 6/22/22 to 6/17/22 on 6/22/2022. (SMH)
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Poder Latinx: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/17/22 to Mark Brnovich . (Adelman, Daniel) *Modified to correct sent on date from 6/22/22 to 6/17/22 on 6/22/2022. (SMH)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Poder Latinx: Certificate of Service upon Stephen Richer, Maricopa County Recorder on 6/16/22 . (Adelman, Daniel) *Modified to add service date on 6/22/2022. (SMH)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Gaona on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Gaona, David)
June 15, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michelle Kanter Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 15, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jon Sherman on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Cecilia Aguilera, Erica Elaine McCabe on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 13, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John A Freedman on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 13, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Leah R Novak on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 13, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeremy Karpatkin, Steve Mayer on behalf of Plaintiff Poder Latinx. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark Brnovich, Katie Hobbs, Stephen Richer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20754863. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1003-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Poder Latinx. (Adelman, Daniel) (ARC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Poder Latinx. (Adelman, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20754863 filed by Poder Latinx.(Adelman, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poder Latinx v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poder Latinx
Represented By: Daniel Jay Adelman
Represented By: John Arak Freedman
Represented By: Cecilia Aguilera
Represented By: Erica Elaine McCabe
Represented By: Jeremy Karpatkin
Represented By: John A Freedman
Represented By: Jon Sherman
Represented By: Leah R Novak
Represented By: Michelle Kanter Cohen
Represented By: Steve Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: Christine Bass
Represented By: David Andrew Gaona
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Yost
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Richer
Represented By: Anna Griffin Critz
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?