Democratic National Committee et al v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee and Arizona Democratic Party
Defendant: Katie Hobbs and Mark Brnovich
Intervenor Defendant: Republican National Committee
Case Number: 2:2022cv01369
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting (90 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 22-cv-1369-DJH shall be consolidated with 2:22-cv-509-PHX-SRB. All future filings shall bear the consolidated case number CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB. There will be no further filings in CV22-01369-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/24/22. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01369-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-DLR) (DXD)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene of the Republican National Committee. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 22cv1369. (DXD)
August 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Seth P Waxman, Daniel S Volchok, Susan M Pelletier on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Unopposed Motion to Consolidate by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order) (Associated Cases: 22-cv-1369-PHX-SRB, 22-cv-509-PHX-SRB, 22-cv-519-PHX-SRB, 22-cv-1003-PHX-SRB, 22-cv-1124-PHX-SRB) (Lee-Cota, Jennifer)
August 22, 2022 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on August 17, 2022 to Mark Brnovich . (Samuels, Bruce)
August 22, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher E Babbitt, Edward Henderson Williams, II on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (87 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB Motion to Transfer Related Case. Case No. 22-cv-1369-DJH shall be marked as related to the consolidated actions and transferred accordingly. All future filings shall be bear the case number CV22-01369-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/19/22. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01369-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-DLR) (DXD)
August 18, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. **Redocketed by Clerk using correct event for statisical purposes** (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-01369-CV-DJH, CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB) (DXD)
August 18, 2022 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 08/17/2022 to Katie Hobbs, Secretary of State . (Samuels, Bruce)
August 18, 2022 Filing 12 **Redocketed at (doc. #14 )** MOTION to Transfer Related Case Unopposed Motion to Transfer to Related Case by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order) (Associated Cases: 22-cv-01369, 22-cv-00509, 22-cv-00519, 22-cv-01003, 22-cv-01124) (Samuels, Bruce) Modified on 8/19/2022 (DXD).
August 16, 2022 Filing 11 **Consolidated at Doc. #19 ** LODGED Proposed Proposed Answer of Intervenor-Defendant Republican National Committee re: #10 MOTION to Intervene. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Republican National Committee. (Langhofer, Kory) Modified on 8/24/2022 (DXD).
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene of Republican National Committee)(Langhofer, Kory)
August 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kory A Langhofer on behalf of Republican National Committee. (Langhofer, Kory)
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. Amendment to #1 Complaint Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Samuels, Bruce)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/15/2022. (LFIG)
August 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mark Brnovich, Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20990923. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01369-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Samuels, Bruce) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Democratic Party. (Samuels, Bruce) (SCA)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Democratic National Committee. (Samuels, Bruce) (SCA)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20990923 filed by Democratic National Committee, Arizona Democratic Party. (Samuels, Bruce) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic National Committee et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Represented By: Christopher E Babbitt
Represented By: Daniel S Volchok
Represented By: Edward Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Seth P Waxman
Represented By: Susan M Pelletier
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Democratic Party
Represented By: Bruce Edward Samuels
Represented By: Christopher E Babbitt
Represented By: Daniel S Volchok
Represented By: Edward Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Seth P Waxman
Represented By: Susan M Pelletier
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Kory A Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?