Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino and Priorities USA
Defendant: Katie Hobbs, Mark Brnovich, Larry Noble, David Stephens, Patty Hansen, Sadie Jo Bingham, Wendy John, Sharie Milheiro, Richard Garcia, Stephen Richer, Kristi Blair, Michael Sample, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Dana Lewis, Suzanne Sainz, Leslie Hoffman, Robyn Pouquette, David Stevens, Michelle Burchill and Richard Colwell
Intervenor: Yuma County Republican Committee
Case Number: 2:2022cv01374
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting Defendants Unopposed Motion #96 . FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Attorney General Mark Brnovich, Defendant Secretary of State Katie Hobbs, and Intervenor-Defendant Yuma County Republican Committee shall respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ("FAC") on or before 11/18/2022. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs shall respond to any motions to dismiss, if one is filed in response to the FAC, on or before 12/23/2022. FURTHER ORDERED replies to any response to a motion to dismiss, if one is filed, shall be made on or before 1/13/2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/3/2022. (KFZ)
October 3, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Jennifer)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Stay of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal #88 is DENIED. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/3/2022. (KFZ)
September 30, 2022 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #88 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibits to Reply)(Wright, Jennifer)
September 29, 2022 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re: #88 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Arellano, Daniel)
September 29, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE re: Emergency Motion for Stay by Katie Hobbs re: #88 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal . (Scharff, Spencer)
September 28, 2022 Filing 91 USCA Case Number re: #90 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-16490, Ninth Circuit. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit) (BAC)
September 28, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Spencer W Klein on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 27, 2022 Filing 90 *NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #87 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Mark Brnovich, Yuma County Republican Committee. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number AAZDC-21146078. (Wright, Jennifer) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 9/28/2022 (LAD).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - responsive pleadings to the Emergency Motion for Stay of Preliminary Injunction of Pending Appeal (Doc. #88 ) are due 9/29/22. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 9/27/22. (NKS)
September 27, 2022 Filing 88 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Mark Brnovich, Yuma County Republican Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brett)
September 26, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings for date of 09/22/2022 before Chief Judge G. MURRAY SNOW re: #90 Notice of Appeal. [Court Reporter: Teri Veres, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7251]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 11/2/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2023. (RAP)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 with respect to A.R.S. 16-1016(12) (Felony Provision) is GRANTED and the Court preliminarily enjoins the law's operation. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 with respect to A.R.S. 16-165(A)(10) and 16-165(b) is GRANTED and the Court preliminarily enjoins the law's operation. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to A.R.S. 16-544(Q)-(R) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/26/2022. (REK)
September 23, 2022 Filing 86 OBJECTION to Secretary of State Hobbs's #74 Notice re Interpretation of SB 1260 by Intervenor Yuma County Republican Committee. (LAD)
September 23, 2022 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Yuma County Republican Committee. (LAD)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Yuma County Republican Committee's ("YCRC") Motion to Intervene (Doc. #49 ) as a defendant in the action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to file the Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction lodged at Doc. #72 . The Response is considered timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to file the Objection to Secretary of State Katie Hobbss Notice re Interpretation of SB 1260 lodged at Doc. #75 . The Objection is considered timely filed. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/23/2022. (LAD)
September 23, 2022 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino for proceedings held on 09/22/2022, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Arellano, Daniel)
September 23, 2022 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Yuma County Republican Committee for proceedings held on 9/22/22, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Johnson, Brett)
September 23, 2022 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Mark Brnovich for proceedings held on September 22, 2022, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Wright, Jennifer)
September 23, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Sambo Dul on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Dul, Sambo)
September 22, 2022 Filing 79 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2022 re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 and Motion to Intervene #49 . Argument presented. IT IS ORDERED taking the motions under advisement. APPEARANCES: Daniel Arellano and Aria Branch for Plaintiffs. Jennifer Wright and Brunn Roysden, III for Defendant Mark Brnovich. Spencer Scharff for Katie Hobbs. Brett Johnson, Colin Ahler, and Tracy Olson for Yuma County Republican Committee. Sambo Dul is also present. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 9:37 AM to 10:58 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
September 21, 2022 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 20, 2022 Filing 77 *JOINDER re #75 by Mark Brnovich . (Wright, Jennifer) *Modified to correct event and add document linkage, attorney noticed on 9/21/2022 (LAD).
September 20, 2022 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett)
September 20, 2022 Filing 75 *(Filed at Doc. #86 ) LODGED Proposed Objection to Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Notice re Interpretation of SB 1260. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett) Modified on 9/23/2022 (LAD).
September 20, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE re: Lodging Objection to Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Notice re Interpretation of SB 1260 by Yuma County Republican Committee re: #73 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Objection to Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Notice re Interpretation of SB 1260)(Johnson, Brett)
September 19, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE re: Defendant Secretary Hobbs's Interpretation of SB 1260 by Katie Hobbs re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Scharff, Spencer)
September 19, 2022 Filing 72 *(Filed at Doc. #85 ) LODGED Proposed [PROPOSED] RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett) Modified on 9/23/2022 (LAD).
September 19, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE re: LODGING PROPOSED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Yuma County Republican Committee re: #62 Order,,,,, Set Motion Hearing,,,,, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,, #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Brett)
September 19, 2022 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wright, Jennifer)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motion for Leave (Doc. #68 ). Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #31 ) shall not exceed 30 pages in length. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/19/2022. (LAD)
September 19, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arellano, Daniel)
September 16, 2022 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 16, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Adams on behalf of Sharie Milheiro. (Adams, Scott)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Granting the Parties' Stipulated Order (Doc. #61 ). The following Defendants listed herein are hereby designated nominal Defendants. The Nominal Defendants SHALL be bound by all future Orders of the Court, including the Final Judgment and any Preliminary Orders. See Order for further information. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/15/2022. (CLM)
September 15, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson R Dalton on behalf of Sadie Jo Bingham. (Dalton, Jefferson)
September 15, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Henry Esplin on behalf of Kristi Blair. (Esplin, Ryan)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED setting an expedited briefing schedule for both motions. The schedule is as follows: 1. The response to the Motion to Intervene (Doc. #49 ) shall be due no later than September 16, 2022. 2. The response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #31 ) shall be due no later than September 19, 2022. The proposed intervenors may lodge a response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction by September 19, 2022, that shall be filed if the Court grants the Motion to Intervene. 3. The reply in support of the Motion to Intervene (Doc. #49 ) shall be due no later than September 20, 2022. 4. The reply in support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #31 ) shall be due no later than September 21, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Plaintiffs' request for a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. [31[). Counsel shall appear in person for the hearing on Thursday, September 22, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/2022. (LAD)
September 14, 2022 Filing 61 STIPULATION NOMINAL PARTY STATUS by Sadie Jo Bingham, Kristi Blair, Michelle Burchill, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Richard Colwell, Richard Garcia, Patty Hansen, Wendy John, Dana Lewis, Sharie Milheiro, Larry Noble, Stephen Richer, Suzanne Sainz, Michael Sample, David Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roubicek, Laura)
September 14, 2022 Filing 60 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 9/14/2022. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Daniel Arellano, and telephonically: Aria Branch, Tina Meng, and Joel Ramirez for Plaintiffs. Jennifer Wright and Brunn Roysden, III for Mark Brnovich. Spencer Scharff (telephonically) for Katie Hobbs. Colleen Connor for Michelle Burchill. Jack O'Connor, III for Stephen Richer. Brett Johnson and Tracy Olson for Yuma County Republican Committee. Laura Roubicek for Richard Garcia and Suzanne Sainz, and also appearing for Sadie Bingham, Kristi Blair, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Patty Hansen, Sharie Milheiro, Richard Colwell, Wendy John, Dana Lewis, Larry Noble, Michael Sample, and David Stevens. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 10:31 AM to 10:43 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
September 14, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by M Colleen Connor on behalf of Michelle Burchill. (Connor, M)
September 14, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Brunn Wall Roysden, III on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Roysden, Brunn)
September 13, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Louise Roubicek on behalf of Richard Garcia, Suzanne Sainz. (Roubicek, Laura) Modified on 9/13/2022 to correct name of Defendant (RMW).
September 13, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE re: Notification of Court's September 8, 2022 Order by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino . (Arellano, Daniel)
September 13, 2022 Filing 55 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Larry Noble, in his official capacity as Apache County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 13, 2022 Filing 54 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Michael Sample, in his official capacity as Navajo County Recorder on 09/02/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 13, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Kerekes on behalf of Richard Colwell. (Kerekes, William)
September 13, 2022 Filing 52 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/12/2022 to Richard Colwell, in his official capacity as Yuma County Recorder . (Arellano, Daniel)
September 13, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack L O'Connor, III on behalf of Stephen Richer. (O'Connor, Jack)
September 12, 2022 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Johnson, Brett)
September 12, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Intervene by Yuma County Republican Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Brett)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendant Wendy John's Motion #43 . FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Wendy John's counsel coordinate with counsel for Defendant Katie Hobbs who is also appearing telephonically in setting up a conference call line for the Court to call into and email the information to Snow_Chambers@azd.uscourts.gov and each other no later than 12:00 p.m. on September 13, 2022. To avoid challenges posed by the use of computers, cell phones, headsets, speaker phones or other devices, counsel is directed to utilize a landline for this Status Conference to ensure clarity of communication with the Court and accurate transcription by the Court Reporter. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/12/2022. (KFZ)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting, in part, Defendant Noble's Motion #41 . FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Noble is excused from the September 14, 2022, Status Conference only until the issue is discussed as to whether there is any objection to excusing Defendant Noble from all proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/12/2022. (KFZ)
September 12, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason S. Moore appearing for Michael Sample. . (Moore, Jason)
September 12, 2022 Filing 45 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Kristi Blair, in her official capacity as Mohave County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 12, 2022 Filing 44 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Richard Garcia, in his official capacity as La Paz County Recorder on 09/06/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 12, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the September 14, 2022 Status Conference by Wendy John. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear by Telephone)(Roof, Jean)
September 12, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Ann Roof on behalf of Wendy John. (Roof, Jean)
September 12, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically or Be Excused by Larry Noble. (Robertson, Celeste)
September 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part #34 Defendant Cochise County Recorder David Stevens' Motion to Be Excused or, In the Alternative to Appear by Telephone or Video at September 14, 2022 Status Conference. Defendant Stevens is excused from the September 14, 2022, Status Conference only until the issue is discussed as to whether there is any objection to excusing Defendant Stevens from all proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 9/9/2022. (RMW)
September 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Defendant Katie Hobbs' Request to Appear by Telephone at September 14, 2022 Status Conference. FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Katie Hobbs' counsel set up a conference call line for the Court to call into and email the information to snow_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov. To avoid challenges posed by the use of computers, cell phones, headsets, speaker phones or other devices, counsel is directed to utilize a landline for this Status Conference to ensure clarity of communication with the Court and accurate transcription by the Court Reporter. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 9/9/2022. (RMW)
September 9, 2022 Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Leslie Hoffman, in her official capacity as Yavapai County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Sharie Milheiro, in her official capacity as Greenlee County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Filing 36 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Patty Hansen, in her official capacity as Coconino County Recorder on 08/31/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Wendy John, in her official capacity as Graham County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Be Excused or Appear Telephonically by David Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roberts, Christine)
September 9, 2022 Filing 33 REQUEST re: Telephonic Appearance at 9-14-22 Status Conference by Defendant Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scharff, Spencer)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 . IT IS ORDERED setting an in-person Status Conference for 9/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall notify ALL Defendants who have been served with the Complaint/Amended Complaint and who may be served prior to the September 14, 2022 Status Conference of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a Notice to the Court of the names of the Defendants that have been notified of the Status Conference and how they were so notified no later than 4:30 p.m. on September 13, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/8/2022. (KFZ)
September 8, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Declaration of Saundra Cole, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Declaration of Ameer Patel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Declaration of Guy Cecil, #4 Proposed Order)(Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Sadie Jo Bingham, in her official capacity as Gila County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon David Stevens, in his official capacity as Cochise County Recorder on 09/06/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Suzanne Sainz, in her official capacity as Santa Cruz County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Dana Lewis, in her official capacity as Pinal County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, in her official capacity as Pima County Recorder on 08/31/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 8, 2022 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Stephen Richer, in his official capacity as Maricopa County Recorder on 09/01/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
September 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Garrett Scharff on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Scharff, Spencer)
September 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Charles Cameron on behalf of Dana Lewis. (Cameron, Craig)
September 6, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Joyce Roberts on behalf of David Stevens. (Roberts, Christine)
September 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Celeste M Robertson on behalf of Larry Noble. (Robertson, Celeste)
September 2, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Voto Latino, Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA.(Arellano, Daniel)
September 2, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Redline))(Arellano, Daniel)
August 31, 2022 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Katie Hobbs, in her official capacity as Secretary of State for the State of Arizona on 08/26/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
August 31, 2022 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Mark Brnovich, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the State of Arizona on 08/26/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
August 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #15 Summons Submitted filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. Defendant name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 29, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Leslie Hoffman, Robyn Pouquette. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 25, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Aria Branch, Joel J Ramirez on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Arellano, Daniel)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Summons Submitted filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. Description of deficiency: Summons submitted for parties not listed as defendants. (BAS)
August 24, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sadie Jo Bingham, Kristi Blair, Mark Brnovich, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Richard Garcia, Patty Hansen, Katie Hobbs, Wendy John, Dana Lewis, Sharie Milheiro, Larry Noble, Stephen Richer, Suzanne Sainz, Michael Sample, David Stephens. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/23/2022. (KFZ)
August 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tina Y Meng on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel Cohen on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 15, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/23/2022. (KFZ)
August 23, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Arellano, Daniel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-1374-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2022 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino, and Priorities USA. (MYE)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20989839. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1374-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20989839 filed by Voto Latino, Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA. (Arellano, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Aria C Branch
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: Daniel J Cohen
Represented By: Joel Ramirez
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Daniel Cohen
Represented By: Joel J Ramirez
Represented By: Spencer W Klein
Represented By: Tina Y Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voto Latino
Represented By: Aria C Branch
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: Daniel J Cohen
Represented By: Joel Ramirez
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Daniel Cohen
Represented By: Joel J Ramirez
Represented By: Spencer W Klein
Represented By: Tina Y Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priorities USA
Represented By: Aria C Branch
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: Daniel J Cohen
Represented By: Joel Ramirez
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Aria Branch
Represented By: Daniel Cohen
Represented By: Joel J Ramirez
Represented By: Spencer W Klein
Represented By: Tina Y Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: Amy B Chan
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Spencer Garrett Scharff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Brunn Wall Roysden, III
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Jennifer Jayne Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Noble
Represented By: Celeste M Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hansen
Represented By: Yvonne W Vieau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie Jo Bingham
Represented By: Jefferson R Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy John
Represented By: Jean Ann Roof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharie Milheiro
Represented By: Jeremy Ford
Represented By: Scott Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garcia
Represented By: Kimberly Janiece Hunley
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Richer
Represented By: Anna Griffin Critz
Represented By: Jack L O'Connor, III
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Blair
Represented By: Ryan Henry Esplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sample
Represented By: Jason S Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Cazares-Kelly
Represented By: Daniel S Jurkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Lewis
Represented By: Craig Charles Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Sainz
Represented By: Kimberly Janiece Hunley
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Pouquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stevens
Represented By: Christine Joyce Roberts
Represented By: Paul Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Burchill
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Thomas M Stoxen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Colwell
Represented By: Minda M Davy
Represented By: William J Kerekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Yuma County Republican Committee
Represented By: Brett William Johnson
Represented By: Colin Patrick Ahler
Represented By: Eric Harmon Spencer
Represented By: Tracy Alice Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?