ENS Labs Ltd et al v. GoDaddy Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: True Names LTD a Singapore corporation doing business as Ethereum Name Service, Virgil Griffith and True Names Limited a Singapore corporation doing business as Ethereum Name Service
Defendant: GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC, Dynadot LLC and Manifold Finance Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv01494
Filed: September 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Lee, Katie)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joinder re: #73 Response to Motion by Defendant Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Gray, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re: #65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction AND REQUEST TO CLARIFY OR AMEND THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Dynadot LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Bokhari, Yusra)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #71 ). The deadline for Defendant Dynadot, LLC to respond to the Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #65 ) is extended from 4/28/2023, to 5/15/2023. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/28/2023. (KJ)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction by Dynadot LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Bokhari, Yusra) *Modified motion type on 4/27/2023 (KJ).
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 *SUPPLEMENT re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Authority in Support by Defendants GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaldis, Haryle) *Modified event on 4/27/2023 (KJ).
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting Plaintiffs True Names, LTD., and Virgil Griffith's Motion to Amend Case Caption to Reflect Change of Party Name (Doc. #64 ). The case caption in this matter shall be amended to reflect Plaintiff True Names, Ltd.s change of name to ENS Labs, Ltd. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/18/2023. (KJ)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION of Nick Johnson re: #65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction . filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Lee, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECLARATION of Alex Urbelis re: #65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction . filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lee, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction . filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Katie)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Katie)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption to Reflect Change of Party Name by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Katie)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dynadot LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Kaldis, Haryle)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Attorney Andrew Pruitt #59 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Andrew Pruitt is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Clerk shall also remove Mr. Pruitt from any further ECF notifications regarding this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/28/2022. (REK)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting the #55 Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file any response in opposition the #49 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants GoDaddy, Inc. and GoDaddy.com LLC is extended January 10, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc. and GoDaddy.com LLC to file any Reply to their Motion to Dismiss is January 31, 2023. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 12/28/2022. (ESG)
December 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Attorney Andrew Pruitt by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Katie)
December 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Lee, Katie)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dynadot LLC. (O'Malley, Kevin)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Gray, John)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION For Extension of Briefing Schedule by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Katie)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Errata re: #52 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaldis, Haryle)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Dynadot LLC, Manifold Finance Incorporated. (JAMA)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Haryle Kaldis on behalf of Defendants GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REQUEST re: for Judicial Notice by Defendants GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Kaldis, Haryle)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE re: Certification of Conferral in Advance of Filing Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1(c) by GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC . (Kaldis, Haryle)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support of #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Kaldis, Haryle)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaldis, Haryle)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC identifying Corporate Parent Go Daddy Operating Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Desert Newco, LLC, Corporate Parent GoDaddy Inc., Corporate Parent GoDaddy.com, LLC for GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC. (Kaldis, Haryle)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DYNADOT, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dynadot LLC.(O'Malley, Kevin)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Vacate filed by Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Gray, John)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DECLARATION of Khori Whittaker re: #44 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Manifold Finance, Inc. by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Katie)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Vacate Preliminary Injunction filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Lee, Katie) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/21/2022 (SST).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to Answer or Respond to the Amended Complaint (Third Request) (Doc. #42 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #24 ) to December 12, 2022. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/9/2022. (JAMA)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION re: #24 Amended Complaint, for Extension of Time for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC & Dynadot LLC to Answer or Respond (Third Request) to the Amended Complaint by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Katie)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to Answer or Respond to the Amended Complaint (Second Request) (Doc. #39 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #24 ) to November 14, 2022. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/1/2022. (JAMA)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #39 Stipulation filed by True Names Limited, Virgil Griffith. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Jacob Canter but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Justin Kingsolver. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION to Answer or Respond (Second Request re: #24 Amended Complaint, by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingsolver, Justin) Modified text on 10/28/2022 (WLP).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to Answer or Respond to the Amended Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #34 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com LLC, and Dynadot LLC to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #24 ) to October 31, 2022. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/27/2022. (JAMA)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Vacate by Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gray, John)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: Having been issued in error, the Minute Order entered on 9/22/2022 (Doc. #25 ) is VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel either file the completed form (attached at Doc. #25 ) or submit the notice not later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Court Order may result in sanctions being imposed. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/12/2022. (JAMA)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants GoDaddy, Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC & Dynadot LLC to Answer or Respond to the Amended Complaint by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Process re: Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Defendant Dynadot LLC on September 29, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Process re: Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Defendant Manifold Finance Inc. on September 23, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Process re: Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC on September 26, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Process re: Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial upon Defendant GoDaddy Inc. on September 26, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Order dated September 9, 2022 upon Dynadot LLC on September 12, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Order dated September 9, 2022 upon Defendant Manifold Finance Inc. on September 12, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin) *Modified to correct service date on 10/5/2022 (REK).
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Order dated September 9, 2022 upon Defendant GoDaddy.com LLC on September 12, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Order dated September 9, 2022 upon Defendant GoDaddy Inc. on September 12, 2022. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 VACATED by Doc. 36: MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #24 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (LAD) Modified on 10/12/2022 (RMW).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Out of state attorney Jeffrey Poston terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy LLC, Dynadot LLC and Manifold Finance Incorporated filed by True Names Limited, Virgil Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Kingsolver, Justin) *Modified to reflect document is against Defendants and not Plaintiffs on 9/22/2022 (LAD).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redlined Version of Amended Complaint)(Kingsolver, Justin)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Katie Lee on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #19 Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, . filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Kingsolver, Justin)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Surety BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. Bond Number: 800145157. (LAD)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/12/2022. (JAMA)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting in part and denying in part the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). The Court will grant Plaintiffs the requested preliminary injunctive relief but will not enter the requested Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent ownership interest in the Domain has been sold or transferred away from Plaintiffs as the registrants, Defendants shall immediately transfer ownership in the Domain back to Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, attendant to this injunctive relief, Plaintiffs must post a bond in the amount of $10,000 under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c) by September 13, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants as soon as practicable, and in any event by September 13, 2022. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/9/2022. (LAD)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/9/2022. Argument held. Order to issue. APPEARANCES: Jacob Canter, Justin Kingslover, Warrington Parker, III and Alexander Urbelis for Plaintiff. Defendants failed to appear. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 1:16 PM to 2:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Andrew Gary Pruitt on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE re: of Supplemental Authority by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause . (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kingsolver, Justin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Warrington S Parker, III, Alexander Urbelis on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jacob S Canter on behalf of Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, TRO Motion, and September 6, 2022 Court Order upon Dynadot LLC on 9/7. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, TRO Motion, and September 6, 2022 Court Order upon GoDaddy, Inc. on 9/6-9/7. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, TRO Motion, and September 6, 2022 Court Order upon GoDaddy.com LLC on 9/6-9/7. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Griffith, True Names Limited: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, TRO Motion, and September 6, 2022 Court Order upon Manifold Finance, Inc. on 9/6-9/7. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve the remaining Defendants with the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), Summons, and TRO Motion (Doc. #2 ), and file certificates of service on the docket for all four Defendants, by September 7, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall provide a copy of this Order to a verified contact at each Defendant (or each Defendant's counsel) by September 7, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' TRO Motion (Doc. #2 ) by September 8, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. (Arizona time). Defendants may consolidate their responses if they so desire. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing on Plaintiffs' TRO Motion (Doc. #2 ) on September 9, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. (Arizona time) before District Judge John J. Tuchi in Courtroom 505, Sandra Day O'Connor Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Each side shall have 45 minutes to make legal argument to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Defendants fail to file a Response to Plaintiffs' TRO Motion (Doc. #2 ) or fail to appear at the hearing, the Court will deem either failure to be Defendants' consent to the Motion being granted. See LRCiv 7.2(i). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/6/2022. (JAMA)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *DECLARATION of Jacob Canter re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) *Document not in compliance with Local Rule, attorney noticed on 9/7/2022 (LAD).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause -Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Dynadot LLC, GoDaddy Incorporated, GoDaddy.com LLC, Manifold Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21065202. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1494-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of Alex Urbelis in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Khori Whittaker in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction by Virgil Griffith, True Names LTD. (Kingsolver, Justin) (JAM)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21065202 filed by True Names LTD, Virgil Griffith. (Kingsolver, Justin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENS Labs Ltd et al v. GoDaddy Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Names LTD a Singapore corporation doing business as Ethereum Name Service
Represented By: Andrew G Pruitt
Represented By: Jacob Canter
Represented By: Jeffrey Poston
Represented By: Justin D Kingsolver
Represented By: Katie Lee
Represented By: Warrington S Parker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Griffith
Represented By: Jacob Canter
Represented By: Jeffrey Poston
Represented By: Justin D Kingsolver
Represented By: Katie Lee
Represented By: Warrington S Parker, III
Represented By: Andrew G Pruitt
Represented By: Alexander Urbelis
Represented By: Andrew Gary Pruitt
Represented By: Jacob S Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Names Limited a Singapore corporation doing business as Ethereum Name Service
Represented By: Alexander Urbelis
Represented By: Andrew Gary Pruitt
Represented By: Jacob S Canter
Represented By: Justin D Kingsolver
Represented By: Katie Lee
Represented By: Warrington S Parker, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy Incorporated
Represented By: Haryle Kaldis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com LLC
Represented By: Haryle Kaldis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynadot LLC
Represented By: Kevin E O'Malley
Represented By: Yusra B Bokhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manifold Finance Incorporated
Represented By: Alexander Raymond LaCroix
Represented By: John Christopher Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?