Promise Arizona et al v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Promise Arizona and Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Defendant: Katie Hobbs, Mark Brnovich, John S Halikowski, Larry Noble, David W Stevens, Patty Hansen, Sadie Jo Bingham, Wendy John, Sharie Milheiro, Richard Garcia, Stephen Richer, Kristi Blair, Michael Sample, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Dana Lewis, Suzanne Sainz, Michelle M Burchill and Richard Colwell
Case Number: 2:2022cv01602
Filed: September 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting (114 and 136 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) Motions to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk is directed to consolidate CV22-01381-PHX-SRB and CV22-01602-PHX-SRB into Mi Familia Vota v. Hobbs, Case No. CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB. The parties shall make all future filings under Case No. CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB. There will be no further filings in CV22-01381-PHX-SRB and CV22-01602-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/10/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-SRB, 2:22-cv-01602-SRB) (CLM)
November 9, 2022 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #47 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Opposition to States Motion for Leave Regarding Motion to Dismiss; and Motion to Strike Lodged Proposed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Lozada, Luis)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: On the Court's own motion; IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on State's Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints Under Rules 12(B)(1) and (B)(6) on December 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/8/22. (MAW)
November 7, 2022 Filing 53 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Graham County Recorder Wendy John on 10/19/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The Application (Doc. #51 ) is granted. Kristen Yost is relieved of any further responsibilities in connection with this action. See Order for further information. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/31/2022. (CLM) Modified to add docket link on 11/2/2022 (CLM).
October 28, 2022 Filing 51 EX PARTE MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Client Consent by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaona, David)
October 28, 2022 Filing 50 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Mohave County Recorder Kristi Blair on 10/14/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 27, 2022 Filing 49 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon La Paz County Recorder Richard Garcia on 10/13/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 48 LODGED Proposed Proposed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss (as supplemented by alienage argument) re: #47 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew)
October 26, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Lodged Motion to Dimiss)(Ensign, Drew)
October 26, 2022 Filing 46 Defendant Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, of Plaintiffs' Promise Arizona and Southwest Voter Registration Project by Katie Hobbs.(Gaona, David)
October 25, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by M Colleen Connor on behalf of Michelle M Burchill. (Connor, M)
October 24, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Ann Roof on behalf of Wendy John. (Roof, Jean)
October 21, 2022 Filing 43 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Yuma County Recorder Richard Colwell on 10/17/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Filing 42 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Pima County Recorder Gabriella Cazarez-Kelly on 10/14/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Filing 41 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Greenlee County Recorder Sharie Milheiro on 10/19/22. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 18, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Louise Roubicek on behalf of Richard Garcia, Suzanne Sainz. (Roubicek, Laura)
October 17, 2022 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Apache County Recorder Larry Noble on 10/04/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 14, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (136 in 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mark Brnovich, Arizona, State of, Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich, Mark Brnovich, Mark Brnovich. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01602-SRB, 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-SRB) (Ensign, Drew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Cochise County Recorder David W. Stevens on 10/13/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 13, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Joyce Roberts on behalf of David W Stevens. (Roberts, Christine)
October 12, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Griffin Critz on behalf of Stephen Richer. (Critz, Anna)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all Defendants shall file an answer or motion to dismiss to the Complaint on or before October 26, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/11/22. (MAW)
October 11, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson R Dalton on behalf of Sadie Jo Bingham. (Dalton, Jefferson)
October 11, 2022 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew)
October 11, 2022 Filing 30 *NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Moore on behalf of Michael Sample. (Moore, Jason) *Modified to correct event and text on 10/12/2022 (REK).
October 10, 2022 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Santa Cruz County Recorder Suzanne Sainz on 10/05/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 10, 2022 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Navajo County Recorder Michael Sample on 10/04/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 10, 2022 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Gila County Recorder Sadie Jo Bingham on 10/05/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 7, 2022 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re: (136 in 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. *Redocketed by CLerk using correct event for statistical purposes* (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-SRB, 2:22-cv-01602-SRB) (DXD)
October 7, 2022 Filing 26 **Redocketed at (Doc. #31 )* RESPONSE to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs Opposition to States Motion to Consolidate; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (Lozada, Luis) *Redocketed by CLerk using correct event for statistical purposes on 10/11/2022 (DXD).
October 7, 2022 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Yavapai County Recorder Michelle Burchill on 10/06/22. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Celeste M Robertson on behalf of Larry Noble. (Robertson, Celeste)
October 5, 2022 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Maricopa County Recorder Stephen Richer on 09/30/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Pinal County Recorder Dana Lewis on 10/03/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Coconino County Recorder Patty Hansen on 10/04/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
October 5, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rose M. Winkeler appearing for Patty Hansen. . (Winkeler, Rose)
October 3, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (136 in 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mark Brnovich, Arizona, State of, Arizona, State of, Mark Brnovich, Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01381-SRB, 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01602-SRB) (Ensign, Drew)
October 3, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Charles Cameron on behalf of Dana Lewis. (Cameron, Craig)
October 3, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Luis Leonardo Lozada on behalf of Plaintiffs Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Kerekes on behalf of Richard Colwell. (Kerekes, William)
September 30, 2022 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Mark Brnovich, Arizona Attorney General on 09/21/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
September 29, 2022 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon John S. Halikowski, Director of the Arizona Department of Transportation on 09/22/2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
September 29, 2022 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief upon Katie Hobbs, Arizona Secretary of State on September 21, 2022. (Ortega, Daniel)
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 Joinder re: (136 in 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Doc. 11 in 2:22-CV-01602. filed by Katie Hobbs. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01602-SRB, 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01381-SRB) (Gaona, David)
September 26, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mark Brnovich. **Redocketed by Clerk using correct event for statistical purposes** (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-01602-PHX-SRB, CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB) (DXD)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 **Redocketed at (Doc. #12 )** MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB) (Ensign, Drew) Modified on 9/27/2022 (DXD).
September 26, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ernest Israel Herrera on behalf of Plaintiffs Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Gaona on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Gaona, David)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sadie Jo Bingham, Kristi Blair, Michelle M Burchill, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Richard Colwell, Richard Garcia, Patty Hansen, Wendy John, Dana Lewis, Sharie Milheiro, Larry Noble, Stephen Richer, Suzanne Sainz, Michael Sample, David W Stevens. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (Ortega, Daniel)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Promise Arizona. (Ortega, Daniel)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Cochise County, #2 Summons Summons Coconino, #3 Summons Summons Gila, #4 Summons Summons Graham, #5 Summons Summons Greenlee, #6 Summons Summons La Paz, #7 Summons Summons Maricopa, #8 Summons Summons Mohave, #9 Summons Summons Navajo, #10 Summons Summons Pima, #11 Summons Summons Pinal, #12 Summons Summons Santa Cruz, #13 Summons Summons Yavapai, #14 Summons Summons Yuma)(Ortega, Daniel)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark Brnovich, John S Halikowski, Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (SCA)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21121209. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01602-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
September 20, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Promise Arizona, Southwest Voter Registration Education Project. (Ortega, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
September 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21121209 filed by Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, Promise Arizona. (Ortega, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Promise Arizona et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Promise Arizona
Represented By: Daniel R Ortega, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest Israel Herrera
Represented By: Luis L Lozada
Represented By: Luis Leonardo Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Voter Registration Education Project
Represented By: Daniel R Ortega, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest Israel Herrera
Represented By: Luis L Lozada
Represented By: Luis Leonardo Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: David Andrew Gaona
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Robert John Makar
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S Halikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Noble
Represented By: Celeste M Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Stevens
Represented By: Christine Joyce Roberts
Represented By: Paul Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Hansen
Represented By: Rose Marie Winkeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadie Jo Bingham
Represented By: Jefferson R Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy John
Represented By: Jean Ann Roof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharie Milheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garcia
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Represented By: Kimberly Janiece Hunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Richer
Represented By: Anna Griffin Critz
Represented By: Jack L O'Connor, III
Represented By: Joseph Eugene LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sample
Represented By: Jason S Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Cazares-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Lewis
Represented By: Craig Charles Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Sainz
Represented By: Kimberly Janiece Hunley
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle M Burchill
Represented By: Thomas M Stoxen
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Colwell
Represented By: William J Kerekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?