Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Clean Elections USA et al
Plaintiff: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans and Voto Latino
Defendant: Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings and Unknown Parties
Consolidated Plaintiff: League of Woman Voters of Arizona
Consolidated Defendant: Lions of Liberty LLC, Yavapai County Preparedness Team, Jim Arroyo, Lucas Cilano, Nicholas Cilano, Brian Mounsey, Toby Fox, Bruce Mounsey and James Johnson
Amicus Curiae: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv01823
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting the parties' Joint #67 Motion to Hold All Deadlines in Abeyance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a one-page joint status report no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order informing the Court of the status of settlement negotiations, and if appropriate, proposing a schedule for further status reports or briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi.(ESG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 9, 2022 Filing 67 Joint MOTION TO HOLD ALL DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE by League of Woman Voters of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua)
November 30, 2022 Filing 66 First MOTION to Dismiss Case CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL by Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Lucero, Veronica)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED extending the time for Defendants to respond to the Complaints in this consolidated case. Defendants shall have until the end of day on 11/30/2022 to respond. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/16/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
November 16, 2022 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Kolodin, Alexander)
November 15, 2022 Filing 63 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kolodin, Alexander) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 11/16/2022 (SST).
November 15, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jared Fletcher Davidson on behalf of Consol Plaintiff League of Woman Voters of Arizona. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the parties shall confer and provide a joint report to the Court stating [i] whether this consolidated case should be dismissed as moot due to the passage of the election or [ii] what issues remain to be resolved. The joint report shall be filed on or before Wednesday, November 16, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/9/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
November 2, 2022 Filing 60 Letter from non-party Linda Jenson. (WLP)
November 2, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE re: Notice of Withdrawal of Emergency Motion Before Ninth Circuit by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ninth Circuit Motion to Withdraw Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal)(Arellano, Daniel)
November 2, 2022 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by League of Woman Voters of Arizona for proceedings held on November 1, 2022, Judge Michael T Liburdi hearing judge(s). (Bendor, Joshua)
November 2, 2022 Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER RE: EXHIBITS - The exhibits marked, whether or not received in evidence, in the above entitled case at the time of the Motion Hearing are returned to respective counsel. (LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 58 *Sealed Declaration by League of Woman Voters of Arizona. (Originally Lodged in CV-22-8196-PHX, Filed in this Case Pursuant to Doc. #50 ) (MAP) *Modified to Correct Text on 11/2/2022 (MAP).
November 1, 2022 Filing 57 Sealed Plaintiff's Witness List Re Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (cc: None) (MAP)
November 1, 2022 Filing 54 Exhibit List by League of Woman Voters of Arizona. (LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 53 Witness List by League of Woman Voters of Arizona. (LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE re: Notice of Compliance by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Order in Related Case)(Arellano, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - See order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/1/2022. (LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 50 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T Liburdi: Hearing on Plaintiff League of Woman Voters of Arizona's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 11/1/2022. Temporary Restraining Order to issue as stated on the record. Motion for Preliminary Injunction is taken under advisement. See attachment for details. (Court Reporter Catherine Taylor.) Hearing held 12:14 PM to 5:31 PM.(LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE re: OF COMPLIANCE by League of Woman Voters of Arizona . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Joint Notice Filed with the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals)(Bendor, Joshua)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall provide a joint notice to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of the agreements and remaining areas of disagreement identified in the bench brief filed at Docket No. #47 in this consolidated case. The joint notice to the Ninth Circuit shall include a copy of the bench brief and proposed order. It shall be filed no later than 10:00 a.m., Arizona time, today. The parties shall file a joint notice of compliance in this consolidated case no later than 10:30 a.m., Arizona time, today. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/1/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 47 BRIEF Bench Brief Regarding Remaining Areas of Disagreement and Notice of Lodging of Proposed Form of Order by Defendants Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kolodin, Alexander)
October 31, 2022 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Luke Cilano Notice of Lodging Declaration of Luke Cilano by Defendants Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Lucero, Veronica)
October 31, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO 435 #44 Transcript Request filed by League of Woman Voters of Arizona. Item(s) are incorrect: 11. DATE OF PROCEEDINGS and Item 17 - TRANSCRIPT REQUESTED: No court proceedings were transcribed or recorded for the requested date of proceeding of 10/31/2022. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correction to the item(s) described above with a valid date of proceeding for transcription in Item 11 and 17. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCH)
October 31, 2022 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by League of Woman Voters of Arizona for proceedings held on October 31, 2022, Judge Michael T Liburdi, Judge Status Conference hearing judge(s). (Bendor, Joshua)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER - This case is hereby consolidated with the related action in CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate case number CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL with CV-22-08196-PCT-MTL. The Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in all the previously listed case numbers. All future filings shall bear case number CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL as the lead case. Defendants Lions of Liberty LLC, Yavapai County Preparedness Team, Jim Arroyo, Lucas Cilano, Nicholas Cilano, Brian Mounsey, Bruce Mounsey, Toby Fox, and James Johnson are dismissed from this action without prejudice. The ten (10) unknown party Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. An evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Arizona's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ) is set for Tuesday, November 1, 2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Counsel shall appear in-person. The parties shall confer to address any potential agreement regarding the issues discussed at the status conference. Defendants counsel shall provide notice, no later than 5:00 PM, today, October 31, 2022, stating whether Defendant Melody Jennings or any other witness will appear telephonically. Counsel for Arizona Alliance shall inform the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of the consolidation of these cases and the pending evidentiary hearing and provide a notice of compliance to this Court. Counsel for the League of Women Voters of Arizona shall provide Defendants' Counsel with immediate notice of any new evidence that may be offered at the evidentiary hearing. All counsel shall confer regarding (a) whether this consolidated case may be resolved, in whole or in part, by agreement and (b) Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Arizona's request to offer testimonial evidence by declaration and under seal. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/31/2022. (WLP)
October 31, 2022 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received inquiries from the public who wish to listen to the 11/1/2022 hearing. Members of the public or of the media seeking access are directed to email AZD-PIO@azd.uscourts.gov to obtain dialing instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 43.1, participants are reminded that audiotaping court proceedings is prohibited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiffs has sent an email to the chambers email asking certain questions about the hearing transcript and courtroom technology information technology. The Court wishes to advise counsel that it is inappropriate to send an email of this nature, even when opposing counsel is copied. The Court will not take any action on the email. Counsel are invited to contact the court reporter, Cathy Taylor, and courtroom deputy, Lisa Richter, to resolve these questions. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/31/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 31, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE re: Compliance by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Consolidation Before the District Court)(Arellano, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Amended BY #43 -- ORDER - This case is hereby consolidated with the related action in CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL. The Clerk of Court shall consolidate case number CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL with CV-22-08196-PCT-MTL. The Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in all the previously listed case numbers. All future filings shall bear case number CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL as the lead case. Defendants Lions of Liberty LLC, Yavapai County Preparedness Team, Jim Arroyo, Lucas Cilano, Nicholas Cilano, Brian Mounsey, Bruce Mounsey, Toby Fox, and James Johnson are dismissed from this action without prejudice. The ten (10) unknown party Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. An evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Arizona's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ) is set for Wednesday, November 1, 2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Counsel shall appear in-person. The parties shall confer to address any potential agreement regarding the issues discussed at the status conference. Defendants' counsel shall provide notice, no later than 5:00 PM, today, October 31, 2022, stating whether Defendant Melody Jennings or any other witness will appear telephonically. Counsel for Arizona Alliance shall inform the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of the consolidation of these cases and the pending evidentiary hearing and provide a notice of compliance to this Court. Counsel for the League of Women Voters of Arizona shall provide Defendants' Counsel with immediate notice of any new evidence that may be offered at the evidentiary hearing. All counsel shall confer regarding (a) whether this consolidated case may be resolved, in whole or in part, by agreement and (b) Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Arizona's request to offer testimonial evidence by declaration and under seal. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/31/2022. Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01823-MTL, 3:22-cv-08196-MTL.(WLP) Modified on 10/31/2022 (WLP).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's October 28, 2022 Order (Doc. #36 ), IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/31/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 31, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Michael Kolodin on behalf of Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Kolodin, Alexander)
October 28, 2022 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arellano, Daniel)
October 28, 2022 Filing 35 USCA Case Number re: #34 Notice of Appeal. Case number 22-16689, Ninth Circuit. (BAC)
October 28, 2022 Filing 34 *NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #32 Order by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number AAZDC-21255422. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Representation Statement)(Arellano, Daniel) *Modified to reflect correct appeal event; attorney noticed on 10/31/2022 (SST).
October 28, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE re: Additional Authority by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans. (DXD)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority (Doc. #28 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Proposed Notice of Additional Authority (lodged at Doc. #29 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss Plaintiff Voto Latino from this case. As this Order is not dispositive, the Clerk of Court shall not close this case. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/28/2022. (LMR)
October 28, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Marcos Mocine-McQueen on behalf of Plaintiff Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 27, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION proceedings held on 10/26/2022, before Judge MICHAEL T. LIBURDI. [Court Reporter: Cathy J. Taylor, RPR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 11/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2023. (RAP)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting (8 in case 3:22-cv-08196-SMB) Motion to Transfer Related Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer case number CV-22-08196-PCT-SMB to United States District Court Judge Michael T. Liburdi. The Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in the previously listed case number. All future filings shall bear case number CV-22-08196-PCT-MTL. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/27/2022. (Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-08196-SMB, 2:22-cv-01823-MTL) (WLP)
October 27, 2022 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings for proceedings held on 10/26/2022, Judge Michael T Liburdi hearing judge(s). (Lucero, Veronica)
October 27, 2022 Filing 29 **Filed at (Doc. #33 )** LODGED Proposed Notice of Additional Authority re: #28 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) Modified on 10/28/2022 (DXD).
October 27, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arellano, Daniel)
October 27, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by League of Women Voters of Arizona. (Associated Cases: CV-22-01823-MTL,CV22-08196-SMB) (Bendor, Joshua)
October 26, 2022 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER RE: EXHIBITS - The exhibits marked, whether or not received in evidence, in the above entitled case at the time of the Motion Hearing are returned to respective counsel. (LMR)
October 26, 2022 Filing 26 Exhibit List by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (LMR)
October 26, 2022 Filing 25 *Witness List by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (LMR) *Modified filed date from 10/27/2022 to 10/26/2022; NEF regenerated on 10/27/2022 (LMR)(CEI).
October 26, 2022 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction upon Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings on 10/25/2022. (Arellano, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino for proceedings held on 10/26/2022, Judge Michael T Liburdi hearing judge(s). (Fox, David)
October 26, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2022. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is taken under advisement. See attachment for details. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 1:07 PM to 4:08 PM.(LMR)
October 26, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE re: Filing of Amended Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arellano, Daniel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of David R. Fox re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD-Social Media Post, #2 Exhibit EE-Press Release, #3 Exhibit FF-Redacted Complaints, #4 Exhibit GG-Email, #5 Exhibit HH-Webpage, #6 Exhibit II-Statement of Interest)(Fox, David)
October 26, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Harleen Kaur Gambhir on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 25, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received inquiries from the public who wish to listen to the October 26, 2022 hearing. Members of public or of the media seeking access are directed to email AZD-PIO@azd.uscourts.gov to obtain dialing instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 43.1, participants are reminded that audiotaping court proceedings is prohibited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 25, 2022 Filing 17 DECLARATION of David R. Fox Regarding Service by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email, #2 Exhibit 2-Email)(Fox, David)
October 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Lucero on behalf of Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Lucero, Veronica)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court provides notice to the parties and counsel that one of three law clerks employed in these chambers is married to Plaintiffs' counsel Daniel A. Arellano. This law clerk is disqualified and screened from participating in every aspect of this case. See Doe v. Cabrera, 134 F. Supp. 3d 439 (D.D.C. 2015). Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/25/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 for Wednesday, October 26, 2022 at 1:00 PM (Arizona Time) in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/25/2022. (LMR)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Status Conference held on 10/25/2022. Discussion is held. Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 is set for 10/26/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Separate order to issue. APPEARANCES: Daniel Arellano, Austin Marshall, David Fox (telephonically), Elisabeth Frost (telephonically), Harleen Gambhir (telephonically), Marcos Mocine-McQueen (telephonically) and Tina Meng (telephonically) for Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Catherine Taylor.) Hearing held 10:09 AM to 10:36 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of David R. Fox regarding service by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice Email)(Fox, David)
October 25, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David Robert Fox, Tina Y Meng, Elisabeth C Frost on behalf of Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status Conference for Tuesday, October 25, 2022 at 10:00 AM (Arizona Time) in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Counsel may appear in-person or telephonically. Counsel should call (888) 363-4735 and use Access Code: 9604594. Please do not use speaker phones and headsets. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/24/2022. (LMR)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-01823-PHX-MTL. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 10/24/2022. (RMW)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Clean Elections USA, Melody Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21235762. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1823-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans and Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Ameer Patel by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Saundra Cole by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Daniel Arellano in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JAM)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21235762 filed by Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans, Voto Latino. (Arellano, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Clean Elections USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Austin Tyler Marshall
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Harleen K Gambhir
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Harleen Kaur Gambhir
Represented By: Tina Y Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voto Latino
Represented By: Austin Tyler Marshall
Represented By: Daniel Abraham Arellano
Represented By: David Fox
Represented By: Harleen K Gambhir
Represented By: Roy Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Tina Y Meng
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Elisabeth C Frost
Represented By: Harleen Kaur Gambhir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Elections USA
Represented By: Alexander Michael Kolodin
Represented By: Veronica Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Jennings
Represented By: Alexander Michael Kolodin
Represented By: Veronica Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: League of Woman Voters of Arizona
Represented By: Jared Fletcher Davidson
Represented By: Rachel F Homer
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Delgado
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Lions of Liberty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Yavapai County Preparedness Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jim Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Lucas Cilano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nicholas Cilano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Brian Mounsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Toby Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bruce Mounsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Represented By: Dana Paikowsky
Represented By: Richard Dellheim
Represented By: Jennifer J Yun
Represented By: Michael Elliot Stewart
Represented By: T Christian Herren, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?