Tohono O'odham Nation et al v. Brnovich et al
Plaintiff: Tohono O'odham Nation, Gila River Indian Community, Keanu Stevens, Alanna Siquieros and LaDonna Jacket
Defendant: Mark Brnovich, Katie Hobbs, Dana Lewis, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Stephen Richer and Michael Sample
Case Number: 2:2022cv01901
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting (184 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB) Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk is directed to consolidate CV-22-1901-PHX-SRB into CV-22-509-PHX-SRB. The parties shall make all future filings under Case No. CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB, and there will be no further filings in CV-22-1901-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/22/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01901-SRB) (CLM)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Katie Hobbs, in her official capacity as Arizona Secretary of State, must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint on or before December 29, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/20/22. (MAW)
December 20, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #21 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint (First Request) by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaona, David)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that (1) the State's Motion for Leave (Doc. #16 ) is withdrawn and (2) the State has until December 29, 2022 to file its answer or other response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/15/22. (MAW)
December 14, 2022 Filing 25 WITHDRAWAL of DOCUMENT #16 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion To Dismiss, STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaint by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messer, Joshua) Modified to correct event on 12/15/2022 (WLP).
December 12, 2022 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community, LaDonna Jacket, Alanna Siquieros, Keanu Stevens, Tohono O'odham Nation: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Amended Complaint upon Michael Sample Navajo County Recorder on 12-12-2022. (Messer, Joshua)
December 12, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Michael Sample. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 9, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community, LaDonna Jacket, Alanna Siquieros, Keanu Stevens, Tohono O'odham Nation. (Rosenbaum, David)
December 9, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tohono O'odham Nation, Gila River Indian Community.(Rosenbaum, David)
December 9, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation [NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenbaum, David)
December 7, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mark Brnovich. **Redocketed by Clerk using correct event for statisical pruposes** (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB, CV-22-01901-PHX-SRB) (DXD)
December 7, 2022 Filing 18 **Redocket at Doc. #19 )** Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-00509-PHX-SRB) (Ensign, Drew) Modified on 12/7/2022 (DXD).
December 1, 2022 Filing 17 *Withdrawn per (Doc. #25 )* LODGED Proposed Consolidated Motion To Dismiss re: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion To Dismiss . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Mark Brnovich. (Ensign, Drew) Modified on 12/23/2022 (CLM).
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 WITHDRAWN pursuant to #25 -- MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Motion To Dismiss by Mark Brnovich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Proposed Consolidated MTD)(Ensign, Drew) Modified on 12/15/2022 (WLP).
November 28, 2022 Remark: Out of state attorneys Ryan Snow and Morgan E Saunders terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Defendant Katie Hobbs, in her official capacity as Arizona Secretary of State must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before December 23, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/21/22. (MAW)
November 21, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ezra D Rosenberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (First Request) by Katie Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaona, David)
November 17, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew L Campbell on behalf of Plaintiffs Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 16, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jacqueline De Leon on behalf of Plaintiffs Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting (165 in case 2:22-cv-00509-SRB; 11 in case 2:22-cv-01901-ESW) Motion to Transfer Related Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case (2:22-cv-01901-ESW) to Judge Susan Bolton. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall bear the case number CV22-01901-PHX-SRB. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/14/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-00509-SRB, 2:22-cv-01901-ESW) (WLP)
November 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Related Case [UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER] by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-519-SRB,CV22-1003-PHX-SRB,CV-22-01124-SRB,CV22-01369-DJH,CV22-509-SRB) (Messer, Joshua)
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Stephen Richer in his official capacity as Maricopa County Recorder on 11/10/22. (Messer, Joshua) Modified to correct service date on 11/14/2022 (WLP).
November 11, 2022 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Mark Brnovich in his official capacity as Attorney General on 11/10/22. (Messer, Joshua) Modified to correct service date on 11/14/2022 (WLP).
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation: Acceptance of Service re: Summons for Defendant Hobbs and Complaint upon D. Andrew Gaona for Defendant Katie Hobbs on 11/10/22. (Messer, Joshua)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Gaona on behalf of Katie Hobbs. (Gaona, David)
November 10, 2022 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Allison Neswood on behalf of Plaintiffs Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dana Lewis: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Craig Cameron on behalf of Dana Lewis on 11/08/2022. (Cameron, Craig)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation: Acceptance of Service re: Summons for Defendant Czares-Kelly and the Complaint upon Daniel Jurkowitz for Pima County Recorder on 11-08-22. (Messer, Joshua)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mark Brnovich, Gabriella Cazares-Kelly, Katie Hobbs, Dana Lewis, Stephen Richer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21288520. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01901-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community, Tohono O'odham Nation. (Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SCA)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21288520 filed by Tohono O'odham Nation, Gila River Indian Community. (Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tohono O'odham Nation et al v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tohono O'odham Nation
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Allison A Neswood
Represented By: Matthew L Campbell
Represented By: Michael Stephen Carter
Represented By: Morgan E Saunders
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Represented By: Jacqueline D DeLeon
Represented By: James Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Javier Garcia Ramos
Represented By: Joshua James Messer
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: Marissa L Sites
Represented By: Allison Neswood
Represented By: Howard Marc Shanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: Allison A Neswood
Represented By: James Thomas Tucker
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Javier Garcia Ramos
Represented By: Joshua James Messer
Represented By: Matthew L Campbell
Represented By: Michael Stephen Carter
Represented By: Morgan E Saunders
Represented By: Ryan Snow
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Represented By: Jacqueline D DeLeon
Represented By: Allison Neswood
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keanu Stevens
Represented By: Allison Neswood
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: James Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Joshua James Messer
Represented By: Matthew L Campbell
Represented By: Michael Stephen Carter
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanna Siquieros
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Allison Neswood
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: Joshua James Messer
Represented By: James Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Matthew L Campbell
Represented By: Michael Stephen Carter
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna Jacket
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: Allison Neswood
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Matthew L Campbell
Represented By: Joshua James Messer
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: James Thomas Tucker
Represented By: Michael Stephen Carter
Represented By: Samantha Blencke Kelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Represented By: David Andrew Gaona
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Cazares-Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?