Hoenack v. Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79 et al
Plaintiff: August Jeremy Hoenack
Defendant: Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79, Joanne M Gunning, Jennifer N MacLennan, Kimberly A Moran, Danielle E Clymer, Melissa A Zuidema and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2022cv01903
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE re: NOTICE TO THE COURT AND DEFENDANT of Record Appeal Ruling as Regards Plaintiff's Motion For Injunction by August Jeremy Hoenack . (Attachments: #1 LC Appeal Ruling)(Hoenack, August)
December 14, 2022 Filing 20 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79. (Patel, Ravi)
December 14, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, / Defendant Litchfield Elementary District Number 79's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79.(Patel, Ravi)
December 13, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendant Injunctive Relief filed by August Jeremy Hoenack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 4)(Hoenack, August)
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Index and Notice Of Filing of NonElectronic Exhibit 1. to Plaintiff's Motion For Injunction by August Jeremy Hoenack re: #12 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendant Injunctive Relief . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List Non-Electronic)(Hoenack, August)
December 12, 2022 Remark: One (1) DVD - as outlined in the Plaintiff August Jeremy Hoenack's re: Notice of Filing Non-Electronic Exhibit 1 as to the Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction, Emergency Motion to Compel (Doc. #17 ) has been received, and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HLA)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibit 1. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/8/22. (SMF)
December 6, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendant Injunctive Relief filed by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Patel, Ravi)
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Non-Electronic exhibit DVD by August Jeremy Hoenack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoenack, August)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Defendant Litchfield Elementary School District Number 79's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #5 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Litchfield Elementary to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 -4) up to and including December 16, 2022. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/22/2022. (JAMA)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendant Injunctive Relief by August Jeremy Jeremy Hoenack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List & Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Injunction Order)(Hoenack, August)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney (Doc. #9 ). The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/21/22. (SST)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79. (Staton, Georgia)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by August Jeremy Hoenack. (7 Pages) (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Supplemental Record by August Jeremy Hoenack. (6 Pages) (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by August Jeremy Hoenack. (13 Pages) (REK)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by August Jeremy Hoenack. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension Defendant's Motion for Extension of time to File an Answer or other Responsive Pleadings)(Staton, Georgia)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/9/2022. (JAMA)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAC)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21288253. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01903-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-010554. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21288253 filed by Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79. (Patel, Ravi) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 -State Court Docket as of 11.3.22, #4 Exhibit 4 - Operative Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Service Documents, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plfs Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint only for Parties that are Indi, #7 Exhibit 7 - Remainder of State Court Docket)(BAC)
November 7, 2022 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice and Demand for Preservation of Documents, Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit, Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint for Individual Parties without prejudice upon Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79 on 10/18/22 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/24/22). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoenack v. Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Jeremy Hoenack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litchfield Elementary School District No. 79
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne M Gunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer N MacLennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle E Clymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa A Zuidema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?