Kraft v. Gainey Ranch Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Defendant: Gainey Ranch Community Association, Karen Epstein, Jim Funk, Charlene A Cruz, Maureen Martha Connolly, Marion Elizabeth Mulcahy, Paige Elizabeth Marks, Lauren Ashleigh Vie, Mulcahy Law Firm PC, John J Tuchi, Steven P Logan, Debra D Lucas, G Murray Snow and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2022cv02135
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #9 Order Dismissing Case,, Set Deadlines, by Plaintiff Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Proposed Order Order to Show)(Kraft, Rune)
January 16, 2023 Filing 14 OBJECTION re: #9 Order Dismissing Case,, Set Deadlines, #12 Order on Motion to Set Aside, Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge by Plaintiff Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Objections (Docs. 9 and 12))(Kraft, Rune)
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 *MOTION for the Court to Issue the Summons re: #8 Summons Submitted, by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs Motion for the Court to Issue the Summons)(Kraft, Rune) *Modified to correct text on 1/17/2023 (REK).
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside #10 and Motion to Recuse #11 are denied. This matter shall remain closed. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/11/2023. (REK)
December 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint in Case No. 22-cv-02136-CDB, #2 Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Retroactive Disqualification of Assigned District Judge and Vacatur, #3 Attachment Certificate of Counsel - Plaintiff's Motion for Retroactive Disqualification of Assigned District Judge and Vacatur, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order - Plaintiff's Motion for Retroactive Disqualification of Assigned District Judge and Vacatur)(Kraft, Rune)
December 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside #9 Order Dismissing Case,, Set Deadlines, by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Set Aside Order (Doc. 9), #2 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Order (Doc. 9))(Kraft, Rune)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint and this action are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must show cause within 30 days why he should not be labeled a vexatious litigant and precluded from filing any further actions concerning the 2018 eviction. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/22/2022. (REK)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Summons KAREN EPSTEIN, #2 Summons JIM FUNK, #3 Summons CHARLENE A. CRUZ, #4 Summons MAUREEN MARTHA CONNOLLY, #5 Summons MARION ELIZABETH MULCAHY, #6 Summons PAIGE ELIZABETH MARKS, #7 Summons LAUREN ASHLEIGH VIE, #8 Summons MULCAHY LAW FIRM, P.C., #9 Summons JOHN J. TUCHI, #10 Summons STEVEN P. LOGAN, #11 Summons DEBRA D. LUCAS, #12 Summons G. MURRAY SNOW)(Kraft, Rune)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/20/2022. (REK)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L. Rayes on 12/19/2022. (ESG)
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 200003726. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-02135-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Rune Kraft. (BAS)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Rune Kraft. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 200003726 filed by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft v. Gainey Ranch Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gainey Ranch Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene A Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Martha Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Elizabeth Mulcahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Elizabeth Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Ashleigh Vie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulcahy Law Firm PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Tuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra D Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Murray Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?