Estolano v. AT&T Services Incorporated
Plaintiff: Angelique Estolano
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2023cv00237
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Incorporated. (Campbell, Stacey)
May 24, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Angelique Estolano. (Foster, Troy)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/17/2023. Dispositive motions due by 12/17/2023. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 10:15 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for additional deadlines and complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/13/2023. (RMV)
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 4/13/2023. Case management deadlines are set. Written order to issue. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Troy Foster for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Stacey Campbell for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 10:00 am to 10:05 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
April 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Incorporated. (Campbell, Stacey)
April 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Angelique Estolano. (Foster, Troy)
March 30, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Angelique Estolano. (Foster, Troy)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services Incorporated . (Campbell, Stacey)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Angelique Estolano . (Foster, Troy) *Modified to correct event on 3/21/2023 (SMF).
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 10:00 AM. The Court anticipates this hearing to be held telephonically. The parties will be provided with call-in information via separate email. The parties are ordered to provide initial disclosures at least 21 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/13/23. (SMF)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 Defendant AT&T Mobility Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) Dkt 1-3 by AT&T Mobility Services LLC.(Campbell, Stacey)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Incorporated, Other Affiliate Cricket Holdco Incorporated, Other Affiliate Leap Wireless International, Incorporated, Other Affiliate LWI Holdco, Incorporated, Other Affiliate New Cingular Wireless Services, Incorporated, Other Affiliate AT&T NCWS Holdings, Incorporated, Other Affiliate SBC Telecom, Incorporated, Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Incorporated for AT&T Mobility Services LLC. (Campbell, Stacey)
February 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Troy Patrick Foster. (Foster, Troy)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/6/2023. (RMV)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM)
February 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AT&T Mobility Services LLC. (REM)
February 6, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21569364. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-00237-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-000115. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21569364 filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC. (Campbell, Stacey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(REM)
February 6, 2023 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Two copies of Waiver, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration for AT&T Mobility Services, LLC on 2/1/2023 were sent to Stacey Campbell of Campbell Litigation, P.C. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/1/2023.) (REM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estolano v. AT&T Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelique Estolano
Represented By: Megan Nicole Weides
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Represented By: Daniel Adam Goldschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC
Represented By: Stacey Alan Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?