Tolbert v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Karen Tolbert
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2023cv00761
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript Index, #3 Admin Process, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdictional, #6 Non Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3, #11 Medical Records Part 4)(Edwards, L)
May 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamala Edwards appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Edwards, L)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - The plaintiff must file and serve on the Commissioner a brief for the requested relief within 30 days after the answer is filed. The Commissioner must file a brief and serve it on the plaintiff within 30 days after service of the plaintiff's brief. The plaintiff may file a reply brief and serve it on the Commissioner within 14 days after service of the Commissioner's brief. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/4/2023. (WLP)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/3/2023. (WLP)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-761-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
May 3, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Karen Tolbert. (Larkin, Robin) (MCO)
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW filed by Karen Tolbert. (Larkin, Robin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolbert v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Tolbert
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: L Jamala Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?