Stevens v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Stevens
Defendant: Arizona, State of, Department of Child Safety, Robert Floring and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv00770
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Michelle Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Linda Eatobn)(Tazioli, Andrea)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2024. Dispositive motions due by 8/16/2024. IT IS ORDERED the 6/22/2023 Rule 16 Case Management Conference is vacated. On 8/30/2024 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the Court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Participants shall have their calendars available for the conference. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/13/2023. (ESG)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Michelle Stevens. (Tazioli, Andrea)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the Stipulated #12 Motion to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff shall have through and including June 30, 2023 to file a Response to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/08/2023. (ESG)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Response to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Michelle Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Response to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Tazioli, Andrea)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion and approving the substitution of counsel of Andrea S. Tazioli and Michael McCanse of NCP Law, LLP, in place of Rhonda Neff of the Law Offices of Rhonda Neff, PLLC. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/7/2023. (WLP)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Motion for Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent by Michelle Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Client Consent, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel with Client Consent)(Tazioli, Andrea)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arizona, State of, Department of Child Safety, Robert Floring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Declaration of R. Floring)(Rhodes, Julie) *Modified to correct filers on 6/6/2023 (REK).
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Court Order by Michelle Stevens re: #5 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, . (Neff, Rhonda)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the #6 Stipulated Motion and extending the deadline for State Defendants to file their Motion to Dismiss, up to and including June 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/09/2023. (ESG)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION by Arizona, State of, Robert Floring, Unknown Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stipulated Motion)(Rhodes, Julie)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 6/22/2023 at 08:45 AM before Judge Susan M Brnovich. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/05/2023. (REK)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/05/2023. (REK)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Unknown Parties, Robert Floring, Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21871217. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-770-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-015285. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21871217 filed by Robert Floring, Department of Child Safety, Arizona, State of, Unknown Parties. (Rhodes, Julie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(JAM)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent, First Amended Complaint upon Department of Child Safety on 4/6/23. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/7/23.) SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent upon Robert Floring on 4/3/23. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/11/23.) SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Notice of Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent, First Amended Complaint upon State of Arizona on 4/5/23. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/12/23.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Stevens
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Rapp
Represented By: Lesli Sorensen
Represented By: Rhonda Elaine Neff
Represented By: Stephen Mufarreh
Represented By: Andrea Suzanne Tazioli
Represented By: Michael Aaron McCanse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Child Safety
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Floring
Represented By: Julie S Rhodes
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?