Cromwell v. Thornell et al
Petitioner: Robert Louis Cromwell
Respondent: Ryan Thornell and Staci Ibarra
Case Number: 2:2023cv00783
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Shaw Hollywood on behalf of Staci Ibarra, Ryan Thornell. (Hollywood, Kaitlin)
June 23, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Robert Louis Cromwell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel)(Czuba, Deborah)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The case management conference currently scheduled for July 7, 2023, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Arizona Federal Public Defender shall file a status report on the status of the authorization process no later than July 14, 2023. Counsel shall be relieved from this duty if new counsel is approved and a motion to substitute has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/14/23. (SMF)
June 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE re: of Conflict and Status Report by Robert Louis Cromwell . (Day, Therese)
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 *NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Robert Louis Cromwell (Day, Therese) *Modified to correct event on 6/14/2023 (SMF).
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Y Garcia on behalf of Robert Louis Cromwell. (Garcia, Jennifer)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. Jon M. Sands, Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona, is appointed as Counsel for Petitioner in this federal habeas corpus proceeding. The Federal Public Defender is authorized to designate an Assistant Public Defender to handle the case. Appointment is made pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3599(a)(2). Counsel shall not represent Petitioner in state forums or prepare any state court pleadings without express authorization of the Court. Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED subject to reconsideration by the Court in the event Petitioner fails to supplement his application with the Certificate of Correctional Official as to Status of Applicants Trust Account. The designated Assistant Federal Public Defender shall file a notice of appearance or substitution with the Court within 10 days from receipt of this Order. The Arizona Attorney General shall file a notice of appearance with the Court within 10 days from receipt of this Order. A case management conference will be held on Friday, July 7, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse in Phoenix. Non-local counsel may, upon request, appear by telephone. Any request to appear by telephone must be made at least 10 days prior to the scheduled conference. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order either electronically or through postal mail to Jeffrey Sparks, Deputy Solicitor General., Section Chief of Capital Litigation. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to Petitioner Robert Louis Cromwell, ADCRR #174456, Arizona State Prison Complex Eyman/Rynning Unit, P.O. Box 3100, Florence AZ 85132. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/10/23. (SMF) *NEF regenerated to Jeffrey Sparks only on 5/10/2023 (NKS).
May 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MAP)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Robert Louis Cromwell. (MAP)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Robert Louis Cromwell. (MAP)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 STATEMENT OF INTENT by Petitioner Robert Louis Cromwell. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cromwell v. Thornell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Louis Cromwell
Represented By: Jennifer Y Garcia
Represented By: Therese Michelle Day
Represented By: Leticia Marquez
Represented By: Deborah A Czuba
Represented By: Jon M Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ryan Thornell
Represented By: Kaitlin Shaw Hollywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Staci Ibarra
Represented By: Kaitlin Shaw Hollywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?