Wong v. Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Candance Wong
Defendant: Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated, Tri-Rotor LLC, Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC, Tri-Rotor Spray & Chemical Incorporated, Bell Textron Incorporated, Alejandro Salas Tamayo, Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Randy Lynn Ogata and Larry K Smith
Case Number: 2:2023cv00882
Filed: May 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Randy Lynn Ogata, Larry K Smith, Alejandro Salas Tamayo. (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OBJECTION re: #20 NOTICE of Party Dismissal to Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Tri-Rotor Crop Services, LLC Without Prejudice by Defendant Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Objection to Dismissal) (McBride, Jarred) *Modified linkage on 7/12/2023 (DXD).
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Candance Wong First Amended Complaint. (Grieco, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Candance Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grieco, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Candance Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Grieco, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Candance Wong. Party Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC terminated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biniazan, Kevin)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Candance Wong. Party Bell Textron Incorporated terminated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biniazan, Kevin)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael R Grieco on behalf of Plaintiff Candance Wong. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file her First Amended Complaint and response to Tri-Rotors 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ) to 7/10/23. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/29/23. (DXD)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Candance Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Biniazan, Kevin). *Modified to add motion part on 6/30/2023 (DXD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motions (Doc. #14 , #15 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion to Remand pursuant to 28 U..S.C. 1447(c), from June 19, 2023 to July 10, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file her response to Tri-Rotor Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss from June 16, 2023 to June 30, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint from June 16, 2023 to June 30, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/16/2023. (WLP)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time for Pl to File Mtn to Remand and 12b6 Response by Candance Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension -Tri Rotor)(Biniazan, Kevin)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mtn to Remand re Def Bell by Candance Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension -Bell)(Biniazan, Kevin)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tracy H Fowler on behalf of Defendant Bell Textron Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Errata re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction), #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction) by Defendants Larry K Smith, Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC, Tri-Rotor Spray & Chemical Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sokolova, Ekaterina)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE re: of Invoking Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S. 1332(A) by Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Randy Lynn Ogata, Alejandro Salas Tamayo . (Sokolova, Ekaterina)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER discharging the Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. #7 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/2/23. (DXD)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter Jurisdiction 12(B)(1)) by Larry K Smith, Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sokolova, Ekaterina) *Modified text on 6/30/2023 (DXD).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal Jurisdiction 12(B)(2)) by Larry K Smith, Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC, Tri-Rotor Spray & Chemical Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sokolova, Ekaterina) *Modified text on 6/30/2023 (DXD).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(B)(6) by Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Randy Lynn Ogata, Larry K Smith, Alejandro Salas Tamayo, Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated, Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC, Tri-Rotor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certification (with Exs. A and B attached)) (Sokolova, Ekaterina) *Modified text on 6/30/2023 (DXD).
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause no later than 6/9/23, as to why this action should not be dismissed as to Defendants Tri-Rotor Ag Services, Inc., Tri-Rotor, LLC, Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Alejandro Salas Tamayo and Randy Lynn Ogata for failure to prosecute, unless before then default has been entered or responsive pleadings have been filed. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this action as to Defendants Tri-Rotor Ag Services, Inc., Tri-Rotor, LLC, Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Alejandro Salas Tamayo and Randy Lynn Ogata on 7/12/23 for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/2/23. (SMF)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Bell Textron Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Bell Textron Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pugel, Rachael)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 7/12/23. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/23. (DXD)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/19/23. (DXD)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21923556. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-00882-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Textron Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley) (BAC)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yuma County Superior Court, case number S1400-CV-202300189. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21923556 filed by Bell Textron Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(BAC)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Tri-Rotor LLC, Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated, Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante, Alejandro Salas Tamayo, Randy Lynn Ogata on 4/17/23 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/18/23). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong v. Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candance Wong
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Represented By: Michael R Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Rotor Ag Services Incorporated
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Rotor LLC
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Rotor Crop Services LLC
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-Rotor Spray & Chemical Incorporated
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Textron Incorporated
Represented By: Ashley N Wiberg
Represented By: Rachael Marie Peters Pugel
Represented By: Tracy H Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Salas Tamayo
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pahoran Alejandro Garcia-Bustamante
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lynn Ogata
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry K Smith
Represented By: Jarred James McBride
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Represented By: Ekaterina Sokolova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?