Threadgill et al v. Saddlebrook Investments LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Threadgill, Oliver Christy and Jake Orzalli
Defendant: Saddlebrook Investments LLC, Stuart Simonsen, Unknown Simonsen, All Done Consulting LLC, Ryan Morgan, Unknown Morgan and Jeff Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2023cv01089
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - A Stipulation to Dismiss this action as to Defendants Saddlebrook Investments, LLC, Stuart Simonsen, and Jeffrey Mitchell shall be filed on or before 10/2/23. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed by this deadline, the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. Plaintiffs shall either dismiss the remaining non-responsive Defendants or seek default against these Defendants by 9/29/23. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/23 is VACATED, to be reset, if necessary, by separate Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/3/23. (DXD)
August 3, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants Saddlebrook Investments, LLC, Stuart Simonsen, and Jeffrey Mitchell Only and Request to Vacate Deadlines by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 20, 2023 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/19/2023 to Jeff Mitchell . (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 18, 2023 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Done Consulting LLC, Ryan Morgan. (DXD)
July 17, 2023 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill: Certificate of Service re: Litigation Hold Demand, Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of Judge, Notice of Errata re Certification and Authorization of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Law, and Order upon Saddlebrook Investments, LLC on 06/24/2023. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 17, 2023 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill: Certificate of Service re: Litigation Hold Demand, Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of Judge, Notice of Errata re Certification and Authorization of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Law, and Order upon Stuart Simonsen on 06/29/2023. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 17, 2023 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli against All Done Consulting, LLC and Ryan Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement Negotiations with Defendants Saddlebrook Investments, LLC and Stuart Simonsen by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Defendants Stuart Simonsen and Saddlebrook Investments, LLC extension until 8/7/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/5/23. (DXD)
July 3, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE re: of Service of Court's Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc 9) by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill . (Dessaules, Jonathan)
July 3, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Simonsen to File Their Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 8/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/29/2023. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 28, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice of Avail of Judge upon Ryan Morgan on June 22, 2023. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice of Avail of Judge upon All Done Consulting, LLC on June 22, 2023. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint, Notice of Errata re Certification and Authorization of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws by Plaintiffs Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate and Authorization)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 9/11/23. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on 9/1223, the Clerk shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/14/23. (DXD)
June 14, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Done Consulting LLC, Jeff Mitchell, Ryan Morgan, Saddlebrook Investments LLC, Stuart Simonsen. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22007247. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1089-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Oliver Christy, Jake Orzalli, Cameron Threadgill. (Wood, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22007247 filed by Jake Orzalli, Oliver Christy, Cameron Threadgill. (Wood, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-8, #4 Certification and Authorization, #5 Certification and Authorization, #6 Certification and Authorization)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Threadgill et al v. Saddlebrook Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Threadgill
Represented By: David Eric Wood
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Christy
Represented By: David Eric Wood
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Orzalli
Represented By: David Eric Wood
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddlebrook Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Done Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?