Miller et al v. DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC et al
Plaintiff: Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Rachel Archibald, Dirk Shupe, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez and Osvaldo Rodriguez
Defendant: DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC, DMB Associates Incorporated, DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties ULC, Christina Christian, Holly Crea, Paul Lillis, Tom Bongiorno and Eric Tune
Case Number: 2:2023cv01402
Filed: July 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Philip Miesen on behalf of Christina Christian. (Miesen, Chad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Philip Miesen on behalf of Eric Tune. (Miesen, Chad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Philip Miesen on behalf of Tom Bongiorno. (Miesen, Chad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Philip Miesen on behalf of Paul Lillis. (Miesen, Chad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Philip Miesen on behalf of Holly Crea. (Miesen, Chad)
August 28, 2023 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC. (Henry, Robert)
August 28, 2023 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC. (Henry, Robert)
August 28, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DMB Associates Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for DMB Associates Incorporated. (Henry, Robert)
August 28, 2023 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brookfield Residential Properties ULC identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for Brookfield Residential Properties ULC. (Henry, Robert)
August 28, 2023 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC. (Henry, Robert)
August 28, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brookfield Eastmark LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brookfield Corporation for Brookfield Eastmark LLC. (Henry, Robert)
August 25, 2023 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon Eric Tune on 08/23/23. (Gotto, Gary)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. All Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint extended until 9/21/23. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is vacated and reset to 11/15/23, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. The remainder of the Order (Doc. #13 ) is otherwise affirmed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/14/23. (DXD)
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties ULC, DMB Associates Incorporated, DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC. (LFIG)
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties ULC, DMB Associates Incorporated, DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Robert)
August 9, 2023 Filing 15 Service Returned Unexecuted by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe : Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order as to Holly Crea. (Gotto, Gary)
August 9, 2023 Filing 14 Service Returned Unexecuted by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe : Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order as to Eric Tune. (Gotto, Gary)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/13/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/3/2023. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 3, 2023 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC on 07-24-23. (Gotto, Gary)
August 3, 2023 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon Brookfield Eastmark LLC on 07-24-23. (Gotto, Gary)
August 3, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon Christina Christian on 07-26-23. (Gotto, Gary)
August 3, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon Brookfield Residential Properties ULC on 07/25/23. (Gotto, Gary)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon DMB Associates, Inc. on 07/21/2023. (Gotto, Gary)
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon Brookfield Residential (Arizona), LLC on 07/21/2023. (Gotto, Gary)
July 25, 2023 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability, Order upon DMB Mesa Proving Grounds, LLC on 07/21/2023. (Gotto, Gary)
July 20, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel Mogin, Tim LaComb on behalf of Plaintiffs Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 10/14/23 pursuant to Rule 4(m). The Clerk shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served on 10/15/23. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/18/23. (DXD)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Tom Bongiorno, Brookfield Eastmark LLC, Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC, Brookfield Residential Properties ULC, Christina Christian, Holly Crea, DMB Associates Incorporated, DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC, Paul Lillis, Eric Tune. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22110401. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-01402-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
July 17, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rachel Archibald, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Monica Miller, Travis Miller, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Dirk Shupe. (Gotto, Gary) (SCA)
July 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22110401 filed by Rachel Archibald, Monica Miller, Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez, Osvaldo Rodriguez, Travis Miller, Dirk Shupe. (Gotto, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Miller
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Miller
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Archibald
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Shupe
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna Brinton- Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osvaldo Rodriguez
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Gary A Gotto
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Timothy Z LaComb
Represented By: Daniel Mogin
Represented By: Tim LaComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Mesa Proving Grounds LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Associates Incorporated
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB/Brookfield Eastmark LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Eastmark LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Residential (Arizona) LLC
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookfield Residential Properties ULC
Represented By: Jennifer Hadley Catero
Represented By: Robert Arthur Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Christian
Represented By: Chad Philip Miesen
Represented By: Kyle Banfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Crea
Represented By: Chad Philip Miesen
Represented By: Kyle Banfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lillis
Represented By: Chad Philip Miesen
Represented By: Kyle Banfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bongiorno
Represented By: Kyle Banfield
Represented By: Chad Philip Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tune
Represented By: Chad Philip Miesen
Represented By: Kyle Banfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?