Kamin Health LLC et al v. 4D Global LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kamin Health LLC and Precious Care Management LLC
Defendant: 4D Global LLC and Chanie Gluck
Case Number: 2:2023cv01491
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 4D Global LLC, Chanie Gluck. (Yetnikoff, Isidore)
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Carter, Ruth)
September 1, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF CONFERRAL by Defendants 4D Global LLC, Chanie Gluck. (Yetnikoff, Isidore) Modified to correct event on 9/5/2023 (WLP).
September 1, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 4D Global LLC, Chanie Gluck. (Yetnikoff, Isidore)
August 29, 2023 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC: Certificate of Service re: Amended Complaint and Summons upon Chanie Gluck on 08/24/2023. (Carter, Ruth)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Isidore Yetnikoff on behalf of 4D Global LLC, Chanie Gluck. (Yetnikoff, Isidore)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Alternative Service. The Court finds service on Defendant Chanie Gluck via email at cgluck@4dglobalinc.com is proper, with concurrent mailing of the summons and pleading to her last-known address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tolling of time to serve Defendant Gluck is extended. Plaintiffs shall have to and including September 30, 2023, to serve Defendant Gluck. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/24/2023. (WLP)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION Order for Service by Email by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carter, Ruth)
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC: Proof of Service re: Amended Complaint and Summons upon 4D Global, LLC on 08/10/2023. (Carter, Ruth)
August 9, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kenneth L Kutner on behalf of Plaintiffs Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/28/2023. (RMV)
July 28, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Forms Amended Diversity Disclosure)(Carter, Ruth)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiffs, two limited liability companies, filed this action in federal court against Defendants, one limited liability company and one individual, alleging federal jurisdiction based on diversity. The Court has reviewed the complaint (Doc. #1 ) and Plaintiffs' corporate and diversity disclosure statements (Docs. #2 #3 #4 ), and observes that none of these documents disclose the citizenship of the members of the LLC Plaintiffs and Defendant. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, an LLC is a citizen of every state of which its owners/members are citizens. See Johnson v. Columbia Props. Anchorage, LP, 437 F.3d 894, 899 (9th Cir. 2006). Without knowing the citizenship of each member of the LLC parties, the Court cannot determine whether it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this dispute. Accordingly, within 7 days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall either (1) amend their complaint and their diversity disclosure statement to include allegations about the citizenship of the members of the LLC parties or (2) otherwise show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/27/2023. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Precious Care Management LLC, Kamin Health LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 4D Global LLC, Chanie Gluck. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 27, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22145803. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1491-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Carter, Ruth) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Carter, Ruth) (JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Precious Care Management LLC. (Carter, Ruth) (JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kamin Health LLC. (Carter, Ruth) (JAM)
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22145803 filed by Kamin Health LLC, Precious Care Management LLC. (Carter, Ruth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamin Health LLC et al v. 4D Global LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamin Health LLC
Represented By: John Charles Mascari
Represented By: Kenneth L Kutner
Represented By: Ruth Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Care Management LLC
Represented By: John Charles Mascari
Represented By: Kenneth L Kutner
Represented By: Ruth Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4D Global LLC
Represented By: Isidore Yetnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanie Gluck
Represented By: Isidore Yetnikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?