Wavve Americas Incorporated v. Unknown Party et al
Plaintiff: Wavve Americas Incorporated
Defendant: Unknown Party and Tumi Max
Case Number: 2:2023cv01819
Filed: August 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tumi Max. (DXD)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Tumi Max by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kyle Kellar, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pont, Ryan) *Modified from motion to application on 10/17/2023 (DXD).
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Wavve Americas Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Tumi Max on September 22, 2023. (Pont, Ryan)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Tumi Max. (DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 *SUMMONS Submitted by Plaintiff Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan) *Modified from additional attachment to summons submitted on 9/22/2023 (DXD).
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant by Alternative Means #15 . Plaintiff may serve Tumi Max via the functioning email address referenced in its Motion #15 . Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/20/23. (REK)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan) *Modified to correct event on 9/18/2023 (DXD).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #13 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (DXD)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION Leave to Serve via Email re: #13 Amended Complaint,,,, #14 Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Kyle Kellar, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pont, Ryan)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Wavve Americas Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1st Amended Complaint)(Pont, Ryan)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit Exhibit AC, #30 Exhibit Exhibit AD, #31 Exhibit Exhibit AE, #32 Exhibit Exhibit AF, #33 Exhibit Exhibit AG, #34 Exhibit Exhibit AH, #35 Exhibit Exhibit AI, #36 Exhibit Exhibit AJ, #37 Exhibit Exhibit AK)(Pont, Ryan)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kyle Wayne Kellar on behalf of Plaintiff Wavve Americas Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Plaintiff may conduct limited, expedited discovery directed to Namecheap, Inc. for the purpose of learning Defendants' identifies as to the registrants of the domain names KOKOA.TV, KOKOATV.NET, and VIDGROUND.COM. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/31/23. (DXD)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration iso Motion for Expedited Discovery, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pont, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information by Plaintiff Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan) Modified on 9/1/2023 (DXD).
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Unknown Party(named as Unknown Registrant Of Vidground.Com), Unknown Party(named as Unknown Registrant Of Kokoa.Tv), Unknown Party(named as Unknown Registrant Of Kokoatv.Net). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Unknown Registrant Of Kokoatv.Net, #2 Summons Unknown Registrant Of Vidground.Com)(Pont, Ryan)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Wavve Americas Incorporated. Unable to issue summons. Summons is missing the attorney's information. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wavve Americas Incorporated. (MYE)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22254341. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1819-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22254341 filed by Wavve Americas Incorporated. (Pont, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit AB, #30 Exhibit AC, #31 Exhibit AD, #32 Exhibit AE, #33 Exhibit AF, #34 Exhibit AG, #35 Exhibit AH, #36 Exhibit AI, #37 Exhibit AJ)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wavve Americas Incorporated v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wavve Americas Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan D Pont
Represented By: Kyle Wayne Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tumi Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?