Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company and Joshua Tindal
Defendant: Heather Lee Williams, Heather Lee Tindal, Cynthia Webb, Jose Mendez and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv01836
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M Becker-Zarling on behalf of Heather Lee Williams. (Becker-Zarling, Gina)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Carlos Velez re: #13 Notice (Other), #12 Order,, Set Deadlines, Certificate of Service of Preliminary Order by Plaintiffs GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Larsen, Caroline)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company re: #12 Order,, Set Deadlines, Notice of Service of Preliminary Order, Dkt. No. 12. (Larsen, Caroline)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 1, 2023, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/25/2023. (SLQ)
September 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Barry I Levy, Steven T Henesy on behalf of Plaintiffs GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 22, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorneys Barry I Levy and Steven Henesy terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statements upon Jose Mendez, Heather Williams, Cynthia Webb, Joshua Tindal on 09-08-2023. (Attachments: #1 Forms Proof of Service, #2 Forms Proof of Service, #3 Forms Proof of Service)(Thorpe, William)
September 6, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jose Mendez, Joshua Tindal, Cynthia Webb, Heather Lee Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 1, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thorpe, William)
September 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. Summons submitted on outdated forms. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use up-to-date summons forms off the U.S. District Court website. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thorpe, William)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22256760. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-1836-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company. (Thorpe, William) (JAM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (JAM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William) (JAM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (JAM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22256760 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lee Williams
Represented By: Gina M Becker-Zarling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lee Tindal
Represented By: Gina M Becker-Zarling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Steven T Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Tindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?