Tucker v. Avondale, City of et al
Plaintiff: Keitha Tucker
Defendant: Avondale, City of, Cardenas Duarte, Unknown Duarte and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv02078
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #19 . Defendants shall have up to and including December 12, 2023, to file their responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/28/2023. (REK)
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Avondale, City of, Cardenas Duarte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wieneke, Kathleen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Van Buren on behalf of Avondale, City of, Cardenas Duarte. (Van Buren, Laura)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Keitha Tucker . (Kelly, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 *Additional Attachment to #17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Keitha Tucker First Amended Complaint. (Kelly, Jason) *Modified to correct event and text on 11/29/2023 (REK).
November 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Amended Complaint filed by Keitha Tucker. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KJ)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Keitha Tucker.(Kelly, Jason)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER discharging the Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. #11 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this matter will be dismissed on December 5, 2023 unless before then responsive pleadings have been filed or defaults entered. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/20/2023. (WLP)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #11 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Keitha Tucker. (Kelly, Jason)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause no later than November 27, 2023, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, unless before then defaults have been entered or responsive pleadings have been filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action on November 28, 2023, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/17/2023. (KLG)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE re: of Service by Keitha Tucker re: #9 Service Executed, . (Kelly, Jason)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Keitha Tucker: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Order/Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 4(m), Order re Rule 12(b) or 12(c) upon Officer Cardenas Duarte and Janes Doe Durate on October 16, 2023. (Kelly, Jason)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE re: of Service by Keitha Tucker re: #7 Service Executed, . (Kelly, Jason)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Keitha Tucker: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Order/Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 4(m), Order re Rule 12(b) or 12(c) upon City of Avondale on October 12, 2023. (Kelly, Jason)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. In the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/4/2023. (KJ)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 1/3/2024. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/4/2023. (KJ)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Avondale, City of, Cardenas Duarte, Unknown Duarte. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22362957. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-2078-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Keitha Tucker. (Kelly, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22362957 filed by Keitha Tucker. (Kelly, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Avondale, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keitha Tucker
Represented By: Anoop Bhatheja
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Taylor, II
Represented By: Jason Michael Kelly
Represented By: Richard D Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale, City of
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Laura A Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Duarte
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Represented By: Laura A Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?