No Labels Party of Arizona v. Fontes
Plaintiff: No Labels Party of Arizona
Defendant: Adrian Fontes
Case Number: 2:2023cv02172
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Adrian Fontes.(Karlson, Kara)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Adrian Fontes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Attached Exhibits)(Karlson, Kara)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulated Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting the deadline for Defendant to his Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to November 30, 2023. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/13/2023. (JAMA)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE re: Joint Notice re Trial Date by No Labels Party of Arizona re: #12 Order. (Pappas, Andrew) *Modified text on 11/14/2023 (DXD).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Adrian Fontes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Extension of Time to File an Answer)(Karlson, Kara)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule and Consolidating the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with the Trial on the Merits (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Secretary of State Adrian Fontes's ("Defendant") response to Plaintiff The No Labels Party of Arizona's ("Plaintiff") Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) is due on November 20, 2023, and Plaintiff's reply brief in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due on December 18, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) will be consolidated with the trial on the merits. The parties do not anticipate at this time the need for an evidentiary hearing; accordingly, an oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction will suffice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting the consolidated hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) and trial on the merits for 9:00 a.m. (Arizona time) on January 5, 2024, before District Judge John J. Tuchi in Courtroom 505, Sandra Day O'Connor Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by November 13, 2023, the parties shall jointly file a Notice informing the Court whether a one trial day is sufficient and the proposed trial date is viable. (See attached Order). (AMENDED one-day trial date). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/7/2023. (JAMA)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *(AMENDED by Doc. #12 )*ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule and Consolidating the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with the Trial on the Merits (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Secretary of State Adrian Fontes's ("Defendant") response to Plaintiff The No Labels Party of Arizona's ("Plaintiff") Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) is due on November 20, 2023, and Plaintiff's reply brief in support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due on December 18, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) will be consolidated with the trial on the merits. The parties do not anticipate at this time the need for an evidentiary hearing; accordingly, an oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction will suffice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting the consolidated hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #6 ) and trial on the merits for 9:00 a.m. (Arizona time) on January 5, 5024, before District Judge John J. Tuchi in Courtroom 505, Sandra Day O'Connor Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by November 13, 2023, the parties shall jointly file a Notice informing the Court whether a one trial day is sufficient and the proposed trial date is viable. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/3/2023. (JAMA) Modified on 11/8/2023 (JAMA).
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION re: #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause by No Labels Party of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pappas, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Karlson on behalf of Adrian Fontes. (Karlson, Kara)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or allDefendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 18, 2024. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/2023. (JAMA)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defectthat would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/20/2023. (JAMA)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by No Labels Party of Arizona. (Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Order)(JAM)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Adrian Fontes. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22407865. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-2172-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by No Labels Party of Arizona. (Rosenbaum, David) (JAM)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by No Labels Party of Arizona. (Rosenbaum, David) (JAM)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22407865 filed by No Labels Party of Arizona. (Rosenbaum, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: No Labels Party of Arizona v. Fontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Labels Party of Arizona
Represented By: David B Rosenbaum
Represented By: Emma Jane Cone-Roddy
Represented By: Andrew George Pappas
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Fontes
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Represented By: Kyle Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?