Bunch v. National Association of Preferred Providers et al
Plaintiff: Lynn M Bunch
Defendant: Harold L Brock, Jr., National Association of Preferred Providers, Triada Assurance Holdings LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Salvasen Health, Salvasen Health Holdings LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Salvasen Health, Salvasen United Association Incorported a Texas corporation doing business as Salvasen Health, Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated, National Individual Insurance Agency LLC, Association Health Care Management Incorporated, Barry Jay Glenn, Rusty Brock, Jacob Brock, Landon Jordan, Rami Hassan, Roy Franklin Anding, Jr. and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv02365
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED. The date for all defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is February 26, 2024. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/26/2024. (SLQ)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Roy Franklin Anding, Jr, Association Health Care Management Incorporated, Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated, Harold L Brock, Jr, Jacob Brock, Rami Hassan, Landon Jordan, National Association of Preferred Providers, National Individual Insurance Agency LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Funkhouser, David)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roy Franklin Anding, Jr, Association Health Care Management Incorporated, Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated, Harold L Brock, Jr, Jacob Brock, Rami Hassan, Landon Jordan, National Association of Preferred Providers, National Individual Insurance Agency LLC: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Roy Franklin Anding, Jr, Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated, Harold L Brock, Jr, Jacob Brock, Rami Hassan, Landon Jordan, National Association of Preferred Providers, National Individual Insurance Agency LLC on 1/4/2024. (Funkhouser, David) *Modified event, text and filers on 1/5/2024 (CSL).
December 27, 2023 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvasen Health Holdings LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/27/2023 to Salvasen Health Holdings, LLC . (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvasen United Association Incorported: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/27/2023 to Salvasen United Association, Inc. . (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Triada Assurance Holdings LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/27/2023 to Triada Assurance Holdings, LLC . (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Barry Jay Glenn: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/27/2023 to Barry Jay Glenn . (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon S Stein on behalf of Salvasen Health Holdings LLC. (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon S Stein on behalf of Salvasen United Association Incorported. (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon S Stein on behalf of Triada Assurance Holdings LLC. (Stein, Brandon)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon S Stein on behalf of Barry Jay Glenn. (Stein, Brandon)
December 20, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian Zimmerman on behalf of Defendant National Individual Insurance Agency LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lynn M Bunch: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Barry Jay Glenn on 12/6/2023. (McGroder, Patrick)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roy Franklin Anding, Jr, Association Health Care Management Incorporated, Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated, Harold L Brock, Jr, Jacob Brock, Barry Jay Glenn, Rami Hassan, Landon Jordan, National Association of Preferred Providers, National Individual Insurance Agency LLC, Salvasen Health Holdings LLC, Salvasen United Association Incorported, Triada Assurance Holdings LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Lynn M Bunch. (Attachments: #1 Summons Anding, #2 Summons Blackhawk, #3 Summons BrockJacob, #4 Summons BrockJr, #5 Summons Glenn, #6 Summons Jordan, #7 Summons Hassan, #8 Summons NAPP, #9 Summons Salvasen Holdings, #10 Summons NIIA, #11 Summons Salvasen United, #12 Summons Triada)(Morris, Alexander)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/15/2023. (CSL)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER/NOTICE: No later than February 8, 2024, Plaintiff shall file proof of service for every defendant located in a judicial district of the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than February 8, 2024, Plaintiff shall file a statement setting forth how and when service on any foreign defendant will be accomplished. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/15/2023. (CSL)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22476106. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-02365-PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22476106 filed by Lynn M Bunch. (Morris, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunch v. National Association of Preferred Providers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold L Brock, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Preferred Providers
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triada Assurance Holdings LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Salvasen Health
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvasen Health Holdings LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Salvasen Health
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvasen United Association Incorported a Texas corporation doing business as Salvasen Health
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Claims Service GA Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Individual Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association Health Care Management Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Jay Glenn
Represented By: Brandon S Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Brock
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Brock
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Jordan
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rami Hassan
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Franklin Anding, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Zimmerman
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn M Bunch
Represented By: Alexander Morris
Represented By: Caroline McGroder
Represented By: Patrick J McGroder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?