McIntee v. Dement et al
Plaintiff: Dyllan McIntee
Defendant: Logan Dement, Unknown Dement and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2023cv02443
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Morrissey for purposes of settlement conference. The parties shall jointly call Magistrate Judge Morrissey's chambers on or before January 23, 2024 to schedule the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/16/2024. (ESG)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/26/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/20/2024. IT IS ORDERED the 1/22/2024 Rule 16 Case Management Conference is vacated. On 1/6/2025 at 9:15 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the Court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Participants shall have their calendars available for the conference. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/16/2024. (ESG)
January 15, 2024 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Logan Dement. (Laskey, H)
January 15, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Logan Dement. (Laskey, H)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Dyllan McIntee re: #11 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, . (Slomski, Ryan)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 1/22/2024 at 9:00 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 10 days before the Case Management Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/12/2023. (ESG)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER this matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/12/2023. (ESG)
December 8, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney Kevin J Banville terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-2443-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 24, 2023 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Cover Sheet by Defendant Logan Dement. (Laskey, H)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Logan Dement. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Required document is not attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Supplemental Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Notice of Removal. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22511508. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-02443-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(REK)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-015029. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22511508 filed by Logan Dement. (submitted by H Laskey) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)
November 22, 2023 ***State Court record received on 11/22/2023*** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dyllan McIntee: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Logan Dement via Director, Arizona Department of Motor Vehicles on 10/24/2023.*** Certificate of Service filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/26/2023, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/22/2023 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for H Brook Laskey on behalf of Defendant Logan Dement. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 22, 2023 ***State Court record received on 11/22/2023*** ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal by Logan Dement.*** Answer filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/16/2023, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/22/2023 for case management purposes.***(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntee v. Dement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyllan McIntee
Represented By: Ryan J Slomski
Represented By: Theodore A Julian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Dement
Represented By: Kevin J Banville
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?