Arizona, State of v. Optum Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Defendant: Evernorth Health Incorporated, Optum Incorporated, OptumRx Incorporated, OptumInsight Incorporated, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark RX LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated, Eli Lilly and Company, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC and Novo Nordisk Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2023cv02688
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in the District of New Jersey. New Case Number: 2:24-cv-00260. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) Transferring Case to the District of New Jersey Re MDL-3080. (MAP)
January 16, 2024 Remark: Case Transferred to the District of New Jersey via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Leslie Kyman Cooper filed by Shane Ham. (Ham, Shane)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Service by Arizona, State of re: #10 Order . (Tann, Joseph)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Susan M Brnovich. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/3/2024. (KJ)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/3/2024. (KJ)
December 29, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Filing of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Tag Notice)(Stein, Lee)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet per 5 by Defendants ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (Hounfodji, Catherine)
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC. (Stein, Lee)
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 *SUPPLEMENT re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark RX LLC . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Court Pleadings, #5 Attachment Verification, #6 Affidavit Notice of Appearance)(Stein, Lee) *Modified event on 12/28/2023 (KJ).
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Notice of Removal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
December 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
December 22, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22602380. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-02688-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (submitted by Catherine Hounfodji) (REK)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-018501. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22602380 filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated. (submitted by Catherine Hounfodji) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Supplemental Cover Sheet), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)
December 22, 2023 ***State Court record received on 12/22/2023***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona, State of: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/06/2023 to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, Caremark RX LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark LLC, Ernorth Health Incorporated, Express Scripts Incorporated, Express Scripts Administrators LLC, Medco Health Solutions Incorporated, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Incorporated, and Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated.***Waivers of Service docketed in U.S. District Court on 12/22/2023 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of v. Optum Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Incorporated
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services Incorporated
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy Incorporated
Represented By: Catherine North Hounfodji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Benjamin J Widlanski
Represented By: Brandon L Bogle
Represented By: Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Catherine Hancock Dorsey
Represented By: Christine C Mansour
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Roland Karim Tellis
Represented By: Russell W Budd
Represented By: Steven J Daroci
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Troy A Rafferty
Represented By: Vince Rabago
Represented By: William F Cash
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Joseph Chambers Tann
Represented By: Leslie Kyman Cooper
Represented By: Mark P Pifko
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Shane Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?