IN RE: Bard Implanted Port Catheter Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Lori Prentice, Jean Cunningham, Patrice Terry, Kimberly Divelbliss, Vincent Anderson, Kriston Kelley, Mary Nelk, Robert Moore, Dana Beltz, Shannon Elwell, Cornelia Dye-Sharpe, Teresa Farmer, John Lafferty, Scott Johnson, Paul Francis Kessler, Tyler Zumalt, Michelle Sanders, Brandie Songy, Linda Mower, Hiliary Russow, Donald Ray McKinley, Adrienne J McKinley, Judy Hicks, Rebecca Green, Mary Ellis, Jay W Sours, Stacey Criner, Susan Farrow, Tracie Lewis Smith, Miles Barnes, Marcene Heeren, Brenda Taylor, Jessica Payne, Shay Whatley, Diana Lesizza, Tamara Swindle, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Vernessa L Williams, Alberta Wilson, Elizabeth Cabello, Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins, Paisami Gay, Tammy Curry, Teddy Doner, Jr., Dalila Harris, Sylvia Canales, Carrie Nedved, Sara Brannen, Jacquese Richard, Helen Kendall, Debbie Groves, Johanna Randow, Robert Cook, Vera Hawkins, Beverly Bigsbee, Anita Burgess, Dene Magnon and Bard Co-Lead Plaintiffs
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and Unknown Parties
In Re: Bard Implanted Port Catheter Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 2:2023md03081
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 64 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 5, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorneys Alex Cameron Walker, Cailynn Danielle Hayter, Caio Formenti, Christopher Gramling, Edward Michael Farmer, Jennifer Kittleson, Kathryn Skagerberg, and Thomas L Cullen, Jr. terminated for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 4, 2023 Filing 63 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Johanna Randow: Return of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Access Systems, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. on October 2, 2023, September 29, 2023, October 2, 2023. (Martin, Ben)
October 4, 2023 Filing 62 SUMMONS Submitted by Rebecca Green. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Yefimenko, Max)
October 4, 2023 Filing 61 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Cook: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Becton, Dickinson and Company; C.R. Bard, Inc.; Bard Access Systems, Inc. on 09/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Sacchet, Michael)
October 4, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Brian Emerson Tadtman. (Tadtman, Brian)
October 4, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Odom on behalf of Robert Cook. (Odom, Megan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Sacchet on behalf of Robert Cook. (Sacchet, Michael)
October 3, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Steven J German. (German, Steven)
October 2, 2023 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 29, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman Balaban on behalf of Beverly Bigsbee, Anita Burgess, Vera Hawkins, Dene Magnon. (Balaban, Roman)
September 29, 2023 Filing 54 SUMMONS Submitted by Teddy Doner, Jr, Marcene Heeren, Diana Lesizza. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Rogers, Danielle)
September 28, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorneys Ashley L Turner, Olga Y Steinreich. Sarah Wolter, Amy K Maloney, Matthew James O'Laughlin, Thomas Pirtle, Brian L Kinsley, Thomas G Kemper, Aaron Dickey, Richard Schwartz, James P Faul, Mark B Desanto, Bradly J Holmes, Dominic F Pechota, Jonathan Matthew Specht, J Michael Weston and Hamilton Jordan terminated for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 27, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Yefimenko on behalf of Beverly Bigsbee, Anita Burgess, Vera Hawkins, Dene Magnon. (Yefimenko, Max)
September 27, 2023 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 26, 2023 Filing 50 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet upon Becton, Dickinson & Company; Bard Access Systems, Inc.; C.R. Bard, Inc. on 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Boldt, Kimberly)
September 26, 2023 Remark: CV-23-2021-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 26, 2023 Remark: CV-23-2023-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 26, 2023 Remark: CV-23-2020-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 26, 2023 Remark: CV-23-2022-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 25, 2023 Filing 49 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elizabeth Cabello: Certificate of Service re: Certificate of Service upon Becton Dickinson and Company, Bard Access Systems, Inc., & C.R. Bard on 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Yefimenko, Max)
September 25, 2023 Filing 48 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4). (MAP)
September 21, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Summerlin on behalf of Jean Cunningham. (Summerlin, Amanda)
September 21, 2023 Filing 46 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Payne: Proof of Service re: Complaint and accompanying documents upon Bard Access Systems, Inc. on 08/03/2023. (Evans, Adam)
September 21, 2023 Filing 45 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Payne: Proof of Service re: Complaint and accompanying documents upon Becton, Dickinson & Company and C.R. Bard, Inc. on 08/01/2023. (Evans, Adam)
September 21, 2023 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 20, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings held on 09/18/2023 before Judge DAVID G. CAMPBELL. [Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper, RDR, CRR, CCP, Telephone number (602) 322-7245]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 10/18/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2023. (RAP)
September 20, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dickerson on behalf of Vincent Anderson, Miles Barnes, Jean Cunningham, Teresa Farmer, Helen Kendall, John Lafferty, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Jessica Payne, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Tyler Zumalt. (Dickerson, Thomas)
September 20, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Megan Odom, Michael A Sacchet on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Cook. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 20, 2023 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Scott B. Seymann. (Seymann, Scott)
September 20, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1975-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of Minnesota) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 19, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1965-PHX-DGC has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 Re Initial Case Management Conference. ORDERED Second Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/19/23. (MAP)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 - Attorney Appointments. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/19/23. (MAP)
September 19, 2023 Filing 40 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3). (MAP)
September 19, 2023 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Vincent Anderson for proceedings held on 09/18/2023, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Evans, Adam)
September 19, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: James R. Holland appearing for Mary Ellis. Attorney James H Wettermark terminated. . (Holland, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Implanted Port Catheter Products Liability Litigation, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company for proceedings held on September 18, 2023, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Fanning, Edward)
September 19, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas Dickerson on behalf of Plaintiff Patrice Terry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
September 19, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Buffy Martines on behalf of Plaintiffs Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins, Scott Johnson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 18, 2023 Filing 39 *MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2023. IT IS ORDERED that all pending motions to dismiss are terminated as moot. FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendants to respond to complaints until entry of the Master Answer. FURTHER ORDERED Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Discussion held regarding Plaintiffs leadership selection. The Court will make a leadership selection within the next two weeks. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 1:32 PM to 3:10 PM. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet)(MAP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2023: #2 Attachment Telephonic Appearances) (MJW). *Modified to add attachment; NEF regenerated on 9/20/2023 (MJW)(CEI).
September 18, 2023 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dalila Harris: Return of Service re: Complaint and accompanying documents upon C.R. Baird on 08/29/2023. (Schiavone, Anne)
September 18, 2023 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 18, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Elise Sanguinetti on behalf of Plaintiffs Stacey Criner, Susan Farrow, Tracie Lewis Smith. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 18, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Amanda Summerlin on behalf of Plaintiff Jacquese Richard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 15, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Evans Stedman on behalf of Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stedman, Claudia)
September 15, 2023 Filing 32 SUMMONS Submitted by Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Boldt, Kimberly)
September 15, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart N Ratzan on behalf of Dana Beltz, Stacey Criner, Tammy Curry, Mary Ellis, Susan Farrow, Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins, Scott Johnson, Lori Prentice, Tracie Lewis Smith, Brenda Taylor. (Ratzan, Stuart)
September 15, 2023 Filing 30 *NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Lynn Boldt on behalf of Lori Prentice; Dana Beltz; Scott Johnson; Mary Ellis; Stacey Criner; Susan Farrow; Brenda Taylor; Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins; Tammy Curry; and Tracy Lewis Smith (Boldt, Kimberly) *Modified to Reflect Correct Filing Parties on 9/15/2023 (MAP).
September 15, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rebecca Lynn Phillips on behalf of Plaintiff Jacquese Richard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 14, 2023 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dalila Harris: Return of Service re: Complaint and accompanying documents upon Bard Access Systems Inc. on 08/22/2023. (Schiavone, Anne)
September 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James Holland, II on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Ellis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Barrie Duchesneau on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Taylor. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 14, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Courtney E Rowley, Nicholas Charles Rowley on behalf of Plaintiff Carrie Nedved. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Elsa Linares-Mascote on behalf of Vincent Anderson, Miles Barnes, Jean Cunningham, Teresa Farmer, Helen Kendall, John Lafferty, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Jessica Payne, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Patrice Terry, Tyler Zumalt. (Linares-Mascote, Elsa)
September 13, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Dickerson on behalf of Miles Barnes, Teresa Farmer, Helen Kendall, John Lafferty, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Jessica Payne, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Tyler Zumalt. (Dickerson, Chelsea)
September 13, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M Evans on behalf of Teresa Farmer, Helen Kendall, John Lafferty, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Jessica Payne, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Tyler Zumalt. (Evans, Adam)
September 12, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Stephen O'Connor on behalf of Jacquese Richard. (O'Connor, Mark)
September 11, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION Appointment of Plaintiff's Leadership Structure by Robert Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenes, Troy)
September 11, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum and Discussion of Issues for the Initial Case Management by Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fanning, Edward)
September 11, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION Appointment of Plaintiff's Leadership Structure by Vincent Anderson, Miles Barnes, Dana Beltz, Sara Brannen, Elizabeth Cabello, Sylvia Canales, Stacey Criner, Jean Cunningham, Tammy Curry, Teddy Doner, Jr, Cornelia Dye-Sharpe, Mary Ellis, Shannon Elwell, Teresa Farmer, Susan Farrow, Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins, Paisami Gay, Rebecca Green, Debbie Groves, Dalila Harris, Marcene Heeren, Judy Hicks, Scott Johnson, Kriston Kelley, Helen Kendall, Paul Francis Kessler, John Lafferty, Diana Lesizza, Adrienne J McKinley, Donald Ray McKinley, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Mary Nelk, Jessica Payne, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Lori Prentice, Jacquese Richard, Hiliary Russow, Michelle Sanders, Tracie Lewis Smith, Brandie Songy, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Brenda Taylor, Patrice Terry, Shay Whatley, Vernessa L Williams, Alberta Wilson, Tyler Zumalt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - MM)(Evans, Adam)
September 11, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: That the member case, CV-23-1840-PHX-DGC, was consolidated into the Lead MDL case MDL-23-3081-PHX error. At this time this case has been removed from the MDL matter until further review. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 8, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J German on behalf of Vincent Anderson. (German, Steven)
September 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Galpern on behalf of Elizabeth Cabello. (Galpern, Michael)
September 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A Emison on behalf of Diana Lesizza. (Emison, Brett)
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A Emison on behalf of Marcene Heeren. (Emison, Brett)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Rogers on behalf of Marcene Heeren. (Rogers, Danielle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Rogers on behalf of Diana Lesizza. (Rogers, Danielle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Rogers on behalf of Teddy Doner, Jr. (Rogers, Danielle)
September 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A Emison on behalf of Teddy Doner, Jr. (Emison, Brett)
September 5, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 1, 2023 *Remark: CV-23-1840-PHX-DGC has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to Reflect Unconsolidated, Clerk Error Pursuant to Doc. 21 on 9/20/2023 (MAP).
September 1, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Elizabeth Cabello. (Yefimenko, Max)
September 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Sean E Cooney on behalf of Plaintiff Teddy Doner, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Larry Frances Taylor, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Sylvia Canales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 1, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Danae N. Benton on behalf of Plaintiff Sylvia Canales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dimitri Dube on behalf of Plaintiff Sylvia Canales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jakob Norman on behalf of Plaintiff Carrie Nedved. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bradley L Leger, Rodney Castille on behalf of Plaintiff Jessica Payne. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 31, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert Andrew Jones on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Swindle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jon Collins Conlin, Tiffany Webber Carpenter on behalf of Plaintiff Tamara Swindle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Makenzie Windfelder on behalf of Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John Jasnoch on behalf of Plaintiff Jacquese Richard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Elsa Linares-Mascote on behalf of Plaintiffs Vincent Anderson, Dana Beltz, Mary Nelk, Patrice Terry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Elizabeth C Helm, Richard B North, Jr, Matthew B Lerner, Brandee J Kowalzyk on behalf of Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Paul Osowski on behalf of Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, C R Bard Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ben C Martin on behalf of Plaintiff Brandie Songy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael A Galpern on behalf of Plaintiff Elizabeth Cabello. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 AMENDED Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Danielle Rogers, Brett A Emison on behalf of Plaintiffs Teddy Doner, Jr, Marcene Heeren, Diana Lesizza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jennifer Elwell on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Mower, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Brandie Songy, Vernessa L Williams. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 30, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Cameron Reid Cano on behalf of Plaintiff Jacquese Richard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 28, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Danielle Rogers, Brett A Emison on behalf of Plaintiffs Vincent Anderson, Miles Barnes, Dana Beltz, Sara Brannen, Elizabeth Cabello, Sylvia Canales, Stacey Criner, Jean Cunningham, Tammy Curry, Kimberly Divelbliss, Teddy Doner, Jr, Cornelia Dye-Sharpe, Mary Ellis, Shannon Elwell, Teresa Farmer, Susan Farrow, Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins, Paisami Gay, Rebecca Green, Dalila Harris, Marcene Heeren, Judy Hicks, Scott Johnson, Kriston Kelley, Helen Kendall, Paul Francis Kessler, John Lafferty, Diana Lesizza, Adrienne J McKinley, Donald Ray McKinley, Robert Moore, Linda Mower, Carrie Nedved, Mary Nelk, Jessica Payne, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Lori Prentice, Jacquese Richard, Hiliary Russow, Michelle Sanders, Tracie Lewis Smith, Brandie Songy, Jay W Sours, Tamara Swindle, Brenda Taylor, Patrice Terry, Shay Whatley, Vernessa L Williams, Alberta Wilson, Tyler Zumalt. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 28, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alex Barlow on behalf of Plaintiff Jacquese Richard. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 28, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Max Yefimenko on behalf of Plaintiff Shannon Elwell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints. FURTHER ORDERED Defendants shall have until October 18, 2023 to respond to any complaint filed in or transferred to this MDL in which a response is due prior to that date. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/23. (MAP)
August 25, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1774-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of Tennessee) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 25, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1766-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Southern District of Iowa) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 25, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1773-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Northern District of California) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian Emerson Tadtman on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Green. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lauren Goodfellow on behalf of Plaintiff Elizabeth Cabello. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shanon Jude Carson on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Mower, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Brandie Songy, Vernessa L Williams. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Tatum O'Brien on behalf of Plaintiff Marcene Heeren. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anne Schiavone on behalf of Plaintiffs Dalila Harris, Tyler Zumalt, Defendant Vernessa L Williams. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1757-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of New York) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1755-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Washington) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James Gerard Stranch, IV on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Lesizza. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1756-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Washington) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2023 *Remark: CV-23-1758-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to correct member case number on 8/24/2023 (MAP). *NEF regenerated on 8/24/23 (NKS)
August 24, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John G Albanese on behalf of Plaintiffs Linda Mower, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Brandie Songy, Defendant Vernessa L Williams. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1764-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Northern District of Texas) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1765-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Southern District of Iowa) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2023 AMENDED Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Roman Balaban on behalf of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Cabello, Shannon Elwell, Paisami Gay, Rebecca Green, Judy Hicks, Paul Francis Kessler, Donald Ray McKinley, Mary Nelk, Hiliary Russow, Alberta Wilson, Defendant Shay Whatley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to Complaints by Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, CR Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fanning, Edward)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER That the motion (Doc. 6 in CV-23-01706) is granted. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to October 18, 2023. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/23. (cc: James Faul and Scott McMillin) (MAP)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. See Document for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/23. (MAP)
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). (MAP)
August 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nickolas Allen on behalf of Plaintiff Kriston Kelley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1735-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Southern District of Texas) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brandon D Henry on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Sanders. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Roman Balaban on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Ellis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert B Brown, III, Thomas P Cartmell on behalf of Plaintiffs Paul Francis Kessler, Michelle Sanders. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1703-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1704-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Central District of Illinois) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to correct district transferred from on 8/21/2023 (MAP).
August 21, 2023 Remark:CV-23-1706-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Central District of Illinois) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1707-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of California) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1702-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Washington) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1705-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Southern District of Alabama) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1700-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of Pennsylvania) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1696-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of Florida) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1708-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of California) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1697-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1698-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1699-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Texas) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1701-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Northern District of Illinois) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1716-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of Colorado) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1709-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of California) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1718-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Tennessee) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1724-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Northern District of Illinois) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1727-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Southern District of Illinois) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1729-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1717-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Tennessee) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1719-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of Florida) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1713-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of South Dakota) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1714-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of Nebraska) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1712-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 21, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1715-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of Colorado) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). (MAP)
August 18, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1690-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of North Carolina) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 18, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1688-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of North Carolina) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 18, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1692-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Middle District of North Carolina) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 18, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1693-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Texas) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 17, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Troy Alexander Brenes on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Moore. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 17, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Wilfred P Coronato, Christopher Andrew Rojao, Edward J Fanning, Jr, Ryan Savercool on behalf of Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, CR Bard Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 16, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Chelsea Dickerson on behalf of Plaintiffs Vincent Anderson, Dana Beltz, Jean Cunningham, Shannon Elwell, Patrice Terry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 16, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kimberly Lynn Boldt, Stuart N Ratzan, Charles N Lakins on behalf of Plaintiffs Vincent Anderson, Dana Beltz, Jean Cunningham, Kimberly Divelbliss, Shannon Elwell, Kriston Kelley, Robert Moore, Mary Nelk, Lori Prentice, Patrice Terry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The parties are advised that an Initial Case Management Conference will be held in this MDL on 9/18/2023 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Counsel shall make themselves available the entire afternoon for discussion. A detailed order regarding material to be filed in advance of the conference will issue in the next few days. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/15/23. (MAP)
August 15, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam M Evans on behalf of Plaintiffs Vincent Anderson, Dana Beltz, Jean Cunningham, Mary Nelk, Patrice Terry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2023 *Remark: CV-23-1662-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of Kansas) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081-PHX-DGC on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to Correct Member Case Number on 8/15/2023 (MAP). *NEF regenerated on 8/15/23 (NKS).
August 15, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel S Wittenberg on behalf of Defendants Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Becton Dickinson and Company, CR Bard Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated (member case CV23-1638-PHX-DGC). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 14, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1640-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: Member Case CV-23-1638-PHX-DGC has been consolidated into Lead Case MDL-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1629-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1626-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1625-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Eastern District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1627-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Mexico) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1630-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1632-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the District of New Jersey) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2023 Remark: CV-23-1631-PHX-DGC (Transferred from the Western District of Missouri) has been consolidated into Lead Case: MDL-23-3081 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that CV-23-00627-PHX-DGC (District of Arizona) is now consolidated with and part of MDL No. 3081. Therefore, future pleadings pertaining to the above case will be filed in MDL-No. 23-MD-3081. (MAP)
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Arizona are transferred to the District of Arizona and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Bard Implanted Port Catheter Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bard Implanted Port Catheter Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Prentice
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Cunningham
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Amanda Summerlin
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Terry
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Divelbliss
Represented By: Charles N Lakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Anderson
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kriston Kelley
Represented By: Nickolas Allen
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nelk
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Represented By: C Lincoln Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Beltz
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Elwell
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Max Yefimenko
Represented By: Olga Y Steinreich
Represented By: Sarah Ann Wolter
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelia Dye-Sharpe
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Brian L Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Farmer
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Brian L Kinsley
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lafferty
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Brian L Kinsley
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Buffy Martines
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Thomas W Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Francis Kessler
Represented By: Robert B Brown, III
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Zumalt
Represented By: Anne Schiavone
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sanders
Represented By: Thomas P Cartmell
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Brandon D Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandie Songy
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Jennifer Elwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mower
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Jennifer Elwell
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiliary Russow
Represented By: Edward Michael Farmer
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray McKinley
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Amy K Maloney
Represented By: Matthew James O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne J McKinley
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Amy K Maloney
Represented By: Matthew James O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hicks
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Thomas G Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Green
Represented By: Brian Emerson Tadtman
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellis
Represented By: James Holland, II
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: James H Wettermark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay W Sours
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: James P Faul
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Criner
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Elise Sanguinetti
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Farrow
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Elise Sanguinetti
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Lewis Smith
Represented By: Elise Sanguinetti
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Barnes
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcene Heeren
Represented By: Brett A Emison
Represented By: Danielle Rogers
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Taylor
Represented By: Barrie Duchesneau
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Payne
Represented By: Bradley L Leger
Represented By: Rodney Castille
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Bradly J Holmes
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shay Whatley
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lesizza
Represented By: Brett A Emison
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Danielle Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Swindle
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Tiffany Webber Carpenter
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Robert Andrew Jones
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Pfaltzgraff
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Mark B Desanto
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Dena R Young
Represented By: Jennifer Elwell
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernessa L Williams
Represented By: John G Albanese
Represented By: Jennifer Elwell
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Richard D Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberta Wilson
Represented By: Aaron K Dickey
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cabello
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Lauren Goodfellow
Represented By: Michael A Galpern
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gaither-Hawkins
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Buffy Martines
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paisami Gay
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Amy K Maloney
Represented By: Matthew James O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Curry
Represented By: Andrew A Lemmon
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Boldt
Represented By: Stuart N Ratzan
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Doner, Jr.
Represented By: Brett A Emison
Represented By: Sean E Cooney
Represented By: Danielle Rogers
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalila Harris
Represented By: Anne Schiavone
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Canales
Represented By: Dimitri Dube
Represented By: Larry Frances Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Danae N. Benton
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Nedved
Represented By: Courtney E Rowley
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Rowley
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Jakob Norman
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Brannen
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Specht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquese Richard
Represented By: Cameron Reid Cano
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Mark Stephen O'Connor
Represented By: Alex Barlow
Represented By: John Jasnoch
Represented By: Rebecca Lynn Phillips
Represented By: Amanda Summerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Kendall
Represented By: Hamilton G Jordan
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Chelsea Dickerson
Represented By: Elsa Linares-Mascote
Represented By: Thomas Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Groves
Represented By: Brett A Emison
Represented By: Danielle Rogers
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Randow
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Jeffrey Roberts Allen
Represented By: Caio Formenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cook
Represented By: Megan Odom
Represented By: Michael A Sacchet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Hawkins
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Dena R Young
Represented By: Max Yefimenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Bigsbee
Represented By: Dena R Young
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Represented By: Max Yefimenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Burgess
Represented By: Dena R Young
Represented By: Max Yefimenko
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dene Magnon
Represented By: Dena R Young
Represented By: Max Yefimenko
Represented By: Roman Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bard Co-Lead Plaintiffs
Represented By: Adam M Evans
Represented By: Michael A Sacchet
Represented By: Rebecca Lynn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company
Represented By: Edward J Fanning, Jr.
Represented By: Makenzie Windfelder
Represented By: Kathryn Skagerberg
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Rojao
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Claudia Evans Stedman
Represented By: Daniel S Wittenberg
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Represented By: Matthew B Lerner
Represented By: Paul Osowski
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Robert Thomas Adams
Represented By: Ryan Savercool
Represented By: Scott McMillin
Represented By: Wilfred P Coronato
Represented By: Ashley L Turner
Represented By: Cailynn Danielle Hayter
Represented By: Christopher T Gramling
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Thomas L Cullen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Robert Thomas Adams
Represented By: Ryan Savercool
Represented By: Scott McMillin
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Represented By: Makenzie Windfelder
Represented By: Wilfred P Coronato
Represented By: Ashley L Turner
Represented By: Cailynn Danielle Hayter
Represented By: Christopher T Gramling
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Represented By: Kathryn Skagerberg
Represented By: Thomas L Cullen, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Rojao
Represented By: Daniel S Wittenberg
Represented By: Edward J Fanning, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew B Lerner
Represented By: Claudia Evans Stedman
Represented By: Paul Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Access Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Edward J Fanning, Jr.
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Rojao
Represented By: Matthew B Lerner
Represented By: Robert Thomas Adams
Represented By: Wilfred P Coronato
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Makenzie Windfelder
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Scott McMillin
Represented By: Ashley L Turner
Represented By: Daniel S Wittenberg
Represented By: Paul Osowski
Represented By: Cailynn Danielle Hayter
Represented By: Christopher T Gramling
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Represented By: Claudia Evans Stedman
Represented By: Ryan Savercool
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Kathryn Skagerberg
Represented By: Thomas L Cullen, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Claudia Evans Stedman
Represented By: Elizabeth C Helm
Represented By: Matthew B Lerner
Represented By: Daniel S Wittenberg
Represented By: Edward J Fanning, Jr.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?