Whaleco Incorporated v. Arroyo et al
Plaintiff: Whaleco Incorporated
Defendant: Jamya Arroyo, Soumen Halder and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00036
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint & Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Whaleco Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Murphy, Robert)
January 26, 2024 Remark: Out of state attorney John C Nix terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Notice of Deposit by Whaleco Incorporated . (Murphy, Robert)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS ORDERED that by no later than January 25, 2024, Plaintiff shall post a bond in the form of a cash deposit of $1,000.00 with the Clerk of Court, in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 67 and LRCiv. 67.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court vacates the Preliminary Injunction Hearing currently scheduled for 1/25/2024 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/22/24. (MJW)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction Order by Plaintiff Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Notice by Whaleco Incorporated . (Murphy, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Shardul S Desai on behalf of Plaintiff Whaleco Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 17, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas Willcox Brooke on behalf of Plaintiff Whaleco Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Proof of Notice of Verified Complaint, Ex Parte Emergency Motion For Temporary Restraining Order, And Related Documents by Whaleco Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John C. Nix Regarding Proof of Notice of Verified Complaint, Ex Parte Emergency Motion For Temporary Restraining Order, And Related Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Attachment Exhibit 10, #13 Attachment Exhibit 11, #14 Attachment Exhibit 12, #15 Attachment Exhibit 13, #16 Attachment Exhibit 14, #17 Attachment Exhibit 15, #18 Attachment Exhibit 16)(Murphy, Robert)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for January 25, 2024 at 1:30 p.m., before the Honorable Judge Steven P. Logan, United States District Judge, in the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, located at 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003, 5th Floor, Courtroom 501. See attached PDF for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/8/24. (MJW)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court no later than April 4, 2024. FURTHER ORDERED that unless the Court orders otherwise, on April 4, 2024, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/8/24. (MJW)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jamya Arroyo, Soumen Halder. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22631523. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00036-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DXD)
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whaleco Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent PPD Holdings Incorporated for Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert) (DXD)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert) (DXD)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DXD)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22631523 filed by Whaleco Incorporated. (Murphy, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-9, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaleco Incorporated v. Arroyo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whaleco Incorporated
Represented By: Robert S Murphy
Represented By: Shardul S Desai
Represented By: Thomas W Brooke
Represented By: John C Nix
Represented By: Thomas Willcox Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamya Arroyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soumen Halder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?