AC Management Group LLC v. Courier Plus Incorporated
Plaintiff: AC Management Group LLC
Defendant: Courier Plus Incorporated a Delaware Corporation doing business as dutchie
Counter Defendant: CJK Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Hana Meds and Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2024cv00071
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Courier Plus Incorporated. (Turbenson, Mitchell)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order for details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/23/2024. (JAMA)
February 22, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by AC Management Group LLC, Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated, CJK Incorporated. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
February 21, 2024 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #21 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (REK)
February 20, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by AC Management Group LLC, Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated, CJK Incorporated.(Dvoren, Michael)
February 14, 2024 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Courier Plus Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Counterclaim upon CJK, Inc. d/b/a Hana Meds on 2/13/2024. (Turbenson, Mitchell)
February 14, 2024 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Courier Plus Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Counterclaim upon Broken Arrow Herbal Center, Inc. on 2/13/2024. (Turbenson, Mitchell)
February 14, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Annaka Nava on behalf of Counter Claimant Courier Plus Incorporated, Defendant Courier Plus Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 14, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brett Michael Schuman, Sharon Ruth Smith, David Rapp-Kirshner on behalf of Counter Claimant Courier Plus Incorporated, Defendant Courier Plus Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 9, 2024 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AC Management Group LLC: Notice of Service re: Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Doc 11 upon Courier Plus Incorporated on 01-30-24. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
February 9, 2024 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated, CJK Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 8, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Courier Plus Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian)
February 8, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Courier Plus Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #12 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (CSL)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Courier Plus Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian)
February 2, 2024 Filing 12 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against AC Management Group LLC, CJK Incorporated, Hana Meds, Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated by Courier Plus Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaCorte, Brian) *Modified to correct counter defendants on 2/6/2024 (REK).
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/25/2024. (CSL)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-00071-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AC Management Group LLC: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Exhibits, Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, Form AO 120, Consent to Exercise of of Jurisdiction upon Courier Plus, Inc on 01-12-2024. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
January 10, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Courier Plus Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22647071. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00071-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by AC Management Group LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (REK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by AC Management Group LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (REK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AC Management Group LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (REK)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22647071 filed by AC Management Group LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AC Management Group LLC v. Courier Plus Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AC Management Group LLC
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Gideon Esakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courier Plus Incorporated a Delaware Corporation doing business as dutchie
Represented By: Annaka Nava
Represented By: Brett Michael Schuman
Represented By: Sharon Ruth Smith
Represented By: Brian William LaCorte
Represented By: David Rapp-Kirshner
Represented By: Mitchell Lee Turbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CJK Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Hana Meds
Represented By: Gideon Esakoff
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Broken Arrow Herbal Center Incorporated
Represented By: Gideon Esakoff
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?