LeTip World Franchise LLC v. Long Island Social Media Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: LeTip World Franchise LLC
Defendant: Long Island Social Media Group LLC, BxB Professionals LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger and Saranto Calamas
Case Number: 2:2024cv00165
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT and Conclusions of Law by Defendants BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. (Grasing, Raymond)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT and Conclusions of Law in Support of Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #44 Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for the submission of proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law is extended until March 11, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until the Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2024. (ESG)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Submitting Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CONTINUED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING proceedings held on 02/22/2024 before Judge SUSAN M. BRNOVICH. [Court Reporter: Christine M. Coaly, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7248]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 3/28/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2024. (RAP)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Supplemental Declaration of Paul Della Valle re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger for proceedings held on 02/22/2024, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Grasing, Raymond)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by LeTip World Franchise LLC for proceedings held on February 22, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Exhibit List re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. (ESG)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Witness List re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. (ESG)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Exhibit List re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (ESG)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Witness List re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (ESG)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Continued Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/22/2024. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order remain in effect until the Court's ruling on the preliminary injunction. See attached pdf for complete details. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 9:12 AM to 11:57 AM.(ESG)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE re: of Submission of additional evidence in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by LeTip World Franchise LLC re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #32 Motion and permitting Plaintiff's representatives to attend the continued evidentiary hearing via video conference. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/21/2024. (ESG)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Request to Appear Via Video Conference Request for Plaintiff's Representatives to Attend Continued Evidentiary Hearing Via Video Conference by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 30 Notice of Deficiency by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger for proceedings held on 02/14/2024, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Grasing, Raymond)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 #29 Transcript Request filed by Heather Pfleger, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Saranto Calamas, BxB Professionals LLC. Item 18 - ORDER: E-mail address not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile and provide an email address for delivery. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
February 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger for proceedings held on 02/14/2024, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Grasing, Raymond)
February 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING proceedings held on 02/14/2024 before Judge SUSAN M. BRNOVICH. [Court Reporter: Elva Cruz-Lauer, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7261]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 3/19/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2024. (RAP)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 27 Notice of Deficiency by LeTip World Franchise LLC for proceedings held on 2-14-2024, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #26 Transcript Request filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Document signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document signed by Carla Walters but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to Jeffrey Wolf. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile Transcript Request with name/signature (sections 1 & 19 of the AO435 form) matching the name of the ECF registered user under whose credentials the document will be re-submitted under. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ALJ)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by LeTip World Franchise LLC for proceedings held on February 14, 2024, Judge Susan M Brnovich hearing judge(s). (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/14/2024. Evidence entered. Court stands at recess until 2/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. See attached pdf for complete details. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer) Hearing held 1:02 PM to 4:23 PM.(ESG)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 *RESPONSE in Opposition and AFFIDAVIT re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. (PLEASE NOTE: An Affidavit was filed as the primary document. The Response is filed at attachment 1) (Attachments: #1 Attachment MOL in Opp, #2 Exhibit S&C in EDNY Action, #3 Exhibit Unreported case)(Grasing, Raymond) *Modified to correct event on 2/12/2024 (CSL).
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Raymond R Grasing on behalf of Defendants BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE re: of Service of Preliminary Order #20 by LeTip World Franchise LLC . (Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting, in part, Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Temporary Restraining Order is hereby entered against all Defendants effective 1/31/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall continue in full force and effect until the hearing on the preliminary injunction sought in this matter, which will be scheduled for 2/14/2024 at 1:00pm (3 hours allowed). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants and their counsel may appear at the 2/14/2024 hearing via Zoom. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court has exercised its discretion to determine that no bond shall be required and that this Order shall be effective immediately. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/1/2024. (ESG)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRELIMINARY ORDER this matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/1/2024. (ESG)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE re: of Lodging Revised Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by LeTip World Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE re: of Lodging Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by LeTip World Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed TRO)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Show Cause Hearing held on 1/31/2024. With no objection by Plaintiff, Mr. Grasing's request for limited appearance for today's hearing pending his application for Pro Hac Vice is granted. Oral argument held as to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #7 ). Clifford Pfleger is sworn and questioned by the Court. The motion is granted. Written Order to issue. IT IS ORDERED setting an Evidentiary Hearing on 2/14/2024 at 1:00 p.m. (AZ time - 3 hrs allowed) for a preliminary injunction. Defendants are allowed to appear via Zoom. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's response is due by 2/9/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties exchange exhibits by no later than 2/12/2024. Plaintiff is directed to lodge a proposed form of Order by no later than 12:00 PM on 2/1/2024. APPEARANCES: Attorney Jeffrey Wolf for Plaintiff. Zoom appearance by Attorney Raymond R. Grasing for Defendants. Also present: Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger and Saranto Calamas. Hearing held 1:00 PM to 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE re: of Filing Letter on Behalf of Non-Admitted Attorney by LeTip World Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 IT IS ORDERED the Show Cause Hearing presently set for 1/31/2024 at 11:00 AM is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!! Show Cause Hearing RESET for 1/31/2024 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M. Brnovich. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Brnovich. (ESG)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC: Return of Service re: Order to Show Cause, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Saranto Calamas on January 26, 2024. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC: Return of Service re: Order to Show Cause, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Heather Pfleger on January 26, 2024. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC: Return of Service re: Order to Show Cause, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Clifford Pfleger on January 26, 2024. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC: Return of Service re: Order to Show Cause, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon BxB Professionals, LLC on January 26, 2024. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC: Return of Service re: Order to Show Cause/Complaint, Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Long Island Social Media Group, LLC on January 26, 2024. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that defendants Long Island Social Media Group, LLC, BxB Professionals, LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger and Saranto Calamas shall appear to show cause, if any, why the injunctive relief requested in Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction with Notice should not be granted on January 31, 2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M. Brnovich. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Summons and Complaint by no later than January 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/25/2024. (ESG)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-24-0165-PHX-SMB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the deadline set regarding Magistrate Judge consent (Doc. #3 ) as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/25/2024. (CSL)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Summer Middleton, #2 Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LeTip World Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent LeTip International, Inc. for LeTip World Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BxB Professionals LLC, Saranto Calamas, Long Island Social Media Group LLC, Clifford Pfleger, Heather Pfleger. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to LeTip World Franchise LLC. (REK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22685270. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00165-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (submitted by Jeffrey Wolf) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22685270 filed by LeTip World Franchise LLC. (submitted by Jeffrey Wolf) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeTip World Franchise LLC v. Long Island Social Media Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeTip World Franchise LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Social Media Group LLC
Represented By: Raymond R Grasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BxB Professionals LLC
Represented By: Raymond R Grasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Pfleger
Represented By: Raymond R Grasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Pfleger
Represented By: Raymond R Grasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saranto Calamas
Represented By: Raymond R Grasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?