Limes et al v. Peoria Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Limes and Jessica Morrison
Defendant: Peoria Unified School District, Michele Haeussler, Allison Griesel, Lisa Bracht and Scott Hoover
Case Number: 2:2024cv00190
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 21 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Lisa Bracht, Allison Griesel, Michele Haeussler, Scott Hoover, Peoria Unified School District. (Reiman, Clarissa)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Scheduling Conference is set for May 21, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. (Arizona time). The Court anticipates this hearing to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties shall jointly file the Plan with the Clerk (e-file the Plan using the Other Documents category and use the drop-down event Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting) not less than seven calendar days before the Scheduling Conference. If a party has been served, but has not appeared, plaintiff or counter-claimant shall give notice of this order to that party. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/14/2024. (KLG)
March 13, 2024 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa Bracht, Allison Griesel, Michele Haeussler, Scott Hoover, Peoria Unified School District.(Reiman, Clarissa)
March 6, 2024 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 03/01/2024 to Lisa Bracht . (Martin, Aaron)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #16 Stipulation for a Two-Week Extension for Defendants to file Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 3/13/2024. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/28/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 28, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending DEF Deadline to Answer Complaint by Lisa Bracht, Allison Griesel, Michele Haeussler, Scott Hoover, Peoria Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time for DEF to File Answer)(Reiman, Clarissa)
February 22, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE re: Service of Order by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison re: #13 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Order. (Martin, Aaron)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/20/24. (KLG)
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-00190-PHX-DLR. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for March 4, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 16, 2024 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Magistrate Judge upon Allison Griesel on 02/07/2024. (Martin, Aaron)
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Magistrate Judge upon Michele Haeussler on 02/07/2024. (Martin, Aaron)
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Magistrate Judge upon Scott Hoover on 02/07/2024. (Martin, Aaron)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Magistrate Judge upon Peoria Unified School District on 02/06/2024. (Martin, Aaron) *Modified to correct text on 2/8/2024 (KLG).
January 29, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lisa Bracht, Allison Griesel, Michele Haeussler, Scott Hoover, Peoria Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 29, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22699848. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00190-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Timothy Limes, Jessica Morrison. (submitted by Aaron Martin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22699848 filed by Jessica Morrison, Timothy Limes. (submitted by Aaron Martin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limes et al v. Peoria Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Limes
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Morrison
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoria Unified School District
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Haeussler
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Griesel
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bracht
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hoover
Represented By: Clarissa Braza Reiman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?