Vazquez v. Century Communities Incorporated
Plaintiff: Salvador Vazquez
Defendant: Century Communities Incorporated and Inspire Home Loans Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2024cv00191
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for April 18, 2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 10 days before the Case Management Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties shall jointly file the Case Management Report with the Clerk not less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton on 3/22/2024. (KMB)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED: All parties shall appear by video teleconference before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge on Tuesday, April 16, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The Court's IT department will provide the parties with connection information prior to the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 3/21/2024. (See Order for complete details)(ARC)
March 21, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inspire Home Loans Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Parkway Financial Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Century Communities, Inc. for Inspire Home Loans Incorporated. (Nucci, Benjamin)
March 21, 2024 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Century Communities Incorporated. (Nucci, Benjamin)
March 21, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Century Communities Incorporated, Inspire Home Loans Incorporated.(Nucci, Benjamin)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file, no later than 14 days after they file their answer, a responsive memorandum to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification (Doc. 10). The deadline for any reply memorandum will be governed by L.R. Civ. 7.2. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton on 3/14/2024. (KMB)
March 14, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Century Communities Incorporated and Inspire Home Loans Incorporated. (KMB)
March 13, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Motion for Conditional Certification by Defendants Century Communities Incorporated, Inspire Home Loans Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Errata, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodard, Joshua)
March 13, 2024 Filing 14 *MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #10 Motion for Conditional Certification by Century Communities Incorporated, Inspire Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woodard, Joshua) *Modified to add linkage on 3/14/2024 (EJA).
March 13, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Woodard on behalf of Century Communities Incorporated, Inspire Home Loans Incorporated. (Woodard, Joshua)
February 29, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona Resident, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated), Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona resident): Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; FIRST AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATION UNDER 29 U.S.C. 201, ET SEQ (WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT); NOTICE OF AMENDMENT AS A MATTER OF COURSE (WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT); VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM; PROOF OF SERVICE upon Inspire Home Loans, Inc. on 24.02.29. (Weiler, James)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona Resident, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated), Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona resident): Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; FIRST AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FOR COMPENSATION UNDER 29 U.S.C. 201, ET SEQ (WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT); NOTICE OF AMENDMENT AS A MATTER OF COURSE (WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT); VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE- EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM; PROOF OF SERVICE upon Century Communities, Inc. on 24.02.29. (Weiler, James)
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class by Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona Resident, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated), Salvador Vazquez(an Arizona resident). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Weiler, James)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Inspire Home Loans Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Salvador Vazquez. (Weiler, James)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 *AMENDED COMPLAINT against Century Communities Incorporated, Inspire Home Loans Incorporated filed by Salvador Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Weiler, James) *Modified to correct text on 2/26/2024 (CSL).
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Salvador Vazquez . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Weiler, James)
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Salvador Vazquez: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM upon Century Communities, Inc. on 24.02.02. (Weiler, James)
January 29, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Century Communities Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 29, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22700705. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00191-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Salvador Vazquez. (submitted by James Weiler) (REK)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22700705 filed by Salvador Vazquez. (submitted by James Weiler) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez v. Century Communities Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Vazquez
Represented By: James Joseph Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Communities Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Represented By: Owen Toepfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Home Loans Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Represented By: Owen Toepfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?