Figueroa v. Super Embroidery LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andres Figueroa
Defendant: Super Embroidery LLC, MPI Embroidery LLC, Michael Palomares and Unknown Palomares
Case Number: 2:2024cv00214
Filed: January 31, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Zoom Settlement Conference held on 3/15/2024. Present were: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II with and for Plaintiff Andres Figueroa; Benjamin Anthony Nucci for Defendants. Discussions are held. A settlement was reached. A court reporter was not present, nor the conference recorded. Later: The parties are directed to file dismissal paperwork with the Court within twenty-one (21) days. Hearing held 10:00 AM to 11:30 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EC)
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 On the Court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED resetting the Zoom Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2024 IN TIME ONLY from 9:30 AM at 10:00 AM, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EC)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Video Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. See Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 2/20/2024. (KJ)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER the #15 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer is GRANTED. Defendants have up to and including April 1, 2024 to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/15/2024. (ESG)
February 12, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by MPI Embroidery LLC, Michael Palomares, Unknown Palomares, Super Embroidery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Tyler)
February 12, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MPI Embroidery LLC. (Thomas, Tyler)
February 12, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Super Embroidery LLC. (Thomas, Tyler)
February 12, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler V Thomas on behalf of MPI Embroidery LLC, Michael Palomares, Unknown Palomares, Super Embroidery LLC. (Thomas, Tyler)
February 12, 2024 Filing 11 Service Returned Unexecuted by Andres Figueroa : Complaint, Summons, Order of Recusal, Preliminary Order as to Jane Doe Palomares. (Bendau, Clifford)
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andres Figueroa: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Order of Recusal, Preliminary Order upon Michael Palomares on 2/2/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
February 12, 2024 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andres Figueroa: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Order of Recusal, Preliminary Order upon MPI Embroidery LLC on 2/2/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
February 12, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Andres Figueroa: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Order of Recusal, Preliminary Order upon Super Embroidery LLC on 2/2/24. (Bendau, Clifford)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/31/2024. (ESG)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER this matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/31/2024. (ESG)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Douglas L Rayes recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-24-00214-PHX-SMB. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/31/2024. (KJ)
January 31, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MPI Embroidery LLC, Michael Palomares, Unknown Palomares, Super Embroidery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22708115. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00214-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
January 31, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Andres Figueroa. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (REK)
January 31, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22708115 filed by Andres Figueroa. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa v. Super Embroidery LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Figueroa
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Embroidery LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Tyler V Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPI Embroidery LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Tyler V Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Palomares
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Tyler V Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Palomares
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Nucci
Represented By: Tyler V Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?