Carda v. Starz American Bar and Grill LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christine Carda
Defendant: Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Dale Collins and Alissa Thompson
Case Number: 2:2024cv00250
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Christine Carda. (Barrat, Jason)
April 2, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Foster, Brian)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendants, and granting #19 Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys Brian J Foster and Ross Meyer of the Foster Law Group are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Defendants in place and stead of Aaron S Ludwig, Anthony P Saccocio, and the Counxel Legal Firm. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/1/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED SETTING a settlement conference in the above captioned matter before the Honorable D. Thomas Ferraro beginning at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, April 19, 2024. The settlement conference will be held remotely. The Court will distribute the information to participate remotely prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 4/1/2024. (ARC)
April 1, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deposition of Tyler Ellsworth, filed by Christine Carda. (Barrat, Jason)
April 1, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Deposition of Kennedy Peak, filed by Christine Carda. (Barrat, Jason)
March 29, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS by Brian J Foster. (Foster, Brian)
March 29, 2024 Filing 19 *MOTION to Substitute Attorney - Brian J. Foster appearing for Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. . (Foster, Brian) *Modified to correct event type and text on 4/1/2024 (KLG).
March 29, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants by Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ludwig, Aaron)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 5/28/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/25/2024. (RMV)
March 22, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson.(Foster, Brian)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #14 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Christine Carda's Verified Complaint, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 3/18/2024. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/8/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Foster, Brian)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Foster on behalf of Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Foster, Brian)
February 27, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Christine Carda. (Barrat, Jason)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Christine Carda. (Barrat, Jason)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #9 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 3/11/2024. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/21/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
February 21, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ludwig, Aaron)
February 15, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christine Carda: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM; ORDER RE: RULE 12(B) MOTIONS upon Starz American Bar and Grill, LLC on 24.02.14. (Barrat, Jason)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christine Carda: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM; ORDER RE: RULE 12(B) MOTIONS upon Dale Collins on 24.02.07. (Barrat, Jason)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christine Carda: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VERIFIED COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FORM; ORDER RE: RULE 12(B) MOTIONS upon Alissa Thompson on 24.02.07. (Barrat, Jason)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/6/2024. (RMV)
February 6, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dale Collins, Starz American Bar and Grill LLC, Alissa Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22726686. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00250-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Christine Carda. (submitted by Jason Barrat) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REK)
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22726686 filed by Christine Carda. (submitted by Jason Barrat) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carda v. Starz American Bar and Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Carda
Represented By: Jason Saul Barrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starz American Bar and Grill LLC
Represented By: Aaron S Ludwig
Represented By: Anthony P Saccocio
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Represented By: Ross P Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Collins
Represented By: Aaron S Ludwig
Represented By: Anthony P Saccocio
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Represented By: Ross P Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alissa Thompson
Represented By: Aaron S Ludwig
Represented By: Anthony P Saccocio
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Represented By: Ross P Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?