Doe et al v. Unknown Party et al
Plaintiff: John N Doe, Jane N Doe and Jane T Doe
Defendant: Unknown Party, Buckeye Valley Fire District, Arizona Fire and Medical Authority and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00252
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/11/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/1/2024. (RMV)
March 29, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Unknown Party.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the #16 Application for Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys Jonathan A. Dessaules and David Eric Wood of Dessaules Law Group are substituted as counsel of record for Defendant John R. Doe, in place of attorneys Jeffery Charles Matura, Laney Boyd, and Melissa Jane England of Barrett & Matura PC. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/29/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arizona Fire and Medical Authority, Buckeye Valley Fire District.(Matura, Jeffrey)
March 29, 2024 Filing 16 Application for Substitution of Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Substitution of Counsel) (Dessaules, Jonathan) *Modified event text on 4/1/2024 (DXD).
March 29, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Dessaules on behalf of Unknown Party. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' #13 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Verified Complaint.The deadline for Defendants' to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including 3/29/2024. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/14/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
March 14, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Arizona Fire and Medical Authority, Buckeye Valley Fire District, Unknown Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matura, Jeffrey)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The ex parte TRO entered on 2/7/24 (Doc. #8 ) is converted into a preliminary injunction that shall remain in effect during the pendency of this case, unless otherwise ordered. The Preliminary Injunction hearing scheduled for 3/12/24 is vacated. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/28/24. (DXD)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Unknown Party. (Matura, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Charles Matura on behalf of Arizona Fire and Medical Authority, Buckeye Valley Fire District, Unknown Party. (Matura, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2024 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jane N Doe, Jane T Doe, John N Doe: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Motions, Orders upon All Defendants on 2/13/24. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Acceptance of Service)(Sorensen, Lesli) *Modified from notice to service executed on 2/14/2024 (DXD).
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #2 ex parte motion for a TRO is GRANTED as follows: 1) Defendant John R. Doe and all persons in active concert or participants with him are enjoined from disclosing intimate visual depictions of Plaintiffs. 2) Defendant John R. Doe and all persons in active concert or participants with him are enjoined from disclosing Plaintiffs' identities to anyone else. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #2 motion for a TRO is converted into a motion for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendant John R. Doe with the Verified Complaint, the preliminary injunction motion, and this order by no later than 2/14/2024 and file proof thereof with the Court. Defendant John R. Doe's response to the preliminary injunction motion is due no later than 2/28/2024. Plaintiffs may file an optional reply by no later than 3/6/2024. The parties shall appear for a preliminary injunction hearing before Judge Douglas L. Rayes in Courtroom 606, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, AZ 85003 on 3/12/2024, at 1:30 PM. By no later than 3/6/2024, the parties shall jointly notify the Court in writing whether this hearing will be an evidentiary hearing or an oral argument on the paper record only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #3 motion to proceed under pseudonyms and for a protective order is GRANTED (see attached Order for details). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/7/2024. (MMO) *Modified from tro order to preliminary injunction order per Order (Doc. #12 ) on 2/29/2024 (DXD).
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/6/2024. (RMV)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arizona Fire and Medical Authority, Buckeye Valley Fire District, Unknown Party. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22729451. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00252-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
February 6, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Jane N Doe, Jane T Doe, John N Doe. (Sorensen, Lesli) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (DXD)
February 6, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym, MOTION for Protective Order by Jane N Doe, Jane T Doe, John N Doe. (Sorensen, Lesli) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DXD)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jane N Doe, Jane T Doe, John N Doe. (Sorensen, Lesli) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DXD) *Modified motion type per Order (Doc. #8 ) on 2/8/2024 (DXD).
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22729451 filed by Jane N Doe, Jane T Doe, John N Doe. (Sorensen, Lesli) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John N Doe
Represented By: Lesli Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane N Doe
Represented By: Lesli Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane T Doe
Represented By: Lesli Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Represented By: Melissa Jane England
Represented By: David Eric Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Laney Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Valley Fire District
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Laney Boyd
Represented By: Melissa Jane England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Fire and Medical Authority
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Matura
Represented By: Laney Boyd
Represented By: Melissa Jane England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?