Bowen v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn E Bowen
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00271
Filed: February 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kathryn E Bowen. (Goldstein, Evan)
March 19, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER Unknown Parties (named as: John Does I-X, and Janes Does I-X (individually and/or as husband and wife), Black Corporations I-X, and White Partnerships I-X) terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2024. Dispositive motions due by 3/7/2025. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/19/2024. (KFZ)
March 19, 2024 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/19/2024. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Evan Goldstein and Austin Kurtz for Plaintiff. Ryan Leibel for Defendant. (Court Reporter Teri Veres.) Hearing held 10:47 AM to 10:51 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Kipling Kurtz on behalf of Kathryn E Bowen. (Kurtz, Austin)
March 11, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Christi Anne Woods. (Woods, Christi)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Kathryn E Bowen. (Goldstein, Evan)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIATLITY ORDER: The parties' Stipulation for Protective and Confidentiality Order (Doc. #11 ) is granted, and for the purpose of discovery in this action of documents, information or other materials that may involve production of confidential, proprietary, or private information for which special protection from public disclosure and from use for any purpose other than prosecuting this litigation may be warranted and for good cause. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/6/2024. (KJ)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Protective and Confidentiality Order by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [proposed] Protective and Confidentiality Order)(Belanger, John)
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 REPORT of Joint Case Management by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Belanger, John)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Belanger, John)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 10:45 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/24. (EJA)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER discharging the Court's February 16, 2024 Order to Show Cause issued to Plaintiff (Doc. #5 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/24. (EJA)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Belanger, John)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *DISCHARGED per (Doc. #7 ) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause no later than February 22, 2024, as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, unless before then default has been entered or a responsive pleading has been filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action on February 23, 2024, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/24. (KLG) Modified on 2/16/2024 (EJA).
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/8/2024. (CSL)
February 8, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22737355. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00271-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
February 8, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (submitted by John Belanger) (REK)
February 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-050224. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC22737355 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (submitted by John Belanger) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)
February 8, 2024 ***State Court record received on 2/08/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kathryn E Bowen: Notice of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Costco Wholesale Corporation via C T Corporation System on 1/25/2024.***Service of Process Transmittal Summary docketed in U.S. District Court on 2/08/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn E Bowen
Represented By: Evan S Goldstein
Represented By: Christi Anne Woods
Represented By: Rory Brian Riley
Represented By: Austin Kipling Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: John J Belanger
Represented By: Ryan Sinay Leibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?