Lewis v. Otis Elevator Company et al
Plaintiff: Adrienne Lewis
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company, Otis Elevator Companys Service LLC, Intel Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2024cv00304
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Jill J Ormond. (Ormond, Jill)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for April 23, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for April 24, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. Ordered by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. (RMC)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Stipulation to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference and Deadline to File Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order (Doc. #11 ) is GRANTED. The Joint Case Management Report and Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order are now due not later than 4/16/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Rule 16 Case Management Conference currently scheduled on 3/22/2024, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED AND RESET for 4/23/2024, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/15/2024. (KJ)
March 15, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference and Deadline to File Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by Otis Elevator Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Continue Rule 16 CMC and Deadline to File Joint Report)(Benke, Joseph)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 3/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/21/2024. (RMV)
February 21, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Otis Elevator Company. (Barrett, Kira)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/21/2024. (RMV)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-00304-PHX-ROS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation. (Tate, J)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Intel Corporation, Otis Elevator Company. (DXD)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22751518. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00304-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (DXD)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-095638. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22751518 filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Benke, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record) (DXD)
February 13, 2024 **State Court record received on 2/13/24** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Adrienne Lewis: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Otise Elevator Company, Intel Corporation on 12/13/23. Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Otise Elevator Companys Service LLC on 12/12/23. **Filed in State Court on 12/19/23 and docketed in US District Court on 2/13/24 for case management purposes.** (DXD) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 13, 2024 **State Court record received on 2/13/24** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Intel Corporation. **Filed in State Court on 1/16/24 and docketed in US District Court on 2/13/24 for case management purposes.**(DXD)
February 13, 2024 **State Court record received on 2/13/24** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Otis Elevator Company. **Filed in State Court on 1/18/24 and docketed in US District Court on 2/13/24 for case management purposes.** (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Otis Elevator Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Lewis
Represented By: Taz F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Represented By: Joseph Benke
Represented By: Kira Nicole Barrett
Represented By: Jill J Ormond
Represented By: Matthew Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Companys Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: J Adam Tate
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?