Drumm v. Aradaya LLC et al
Defendant: Aradaya LLC, Douglas M Wood and Thea M Wood
Counter Defendant: Alisha Drumm
Case Number: 2:2024cv00316
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting the Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Doc. #19 ) but warning the parties that, as explained in this Order, any future failure to comply with the rules applicable to this case will be met with sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to aside the default entered against Defendants (Doc. #18 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/11/24. (EJA)
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 *Defendants' ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM Aradaya, LLC against All Plaintiffs by Thea M Wood, Aradaya LLC, Douglas M Wood.(Palmer, Adam) *Modified to reflect the document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney notified on 4/9/2024 (EJA).
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #11 Amended Complaint Stipulated by Alisha Drumm. (Bailey, Ryan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 *SET ASIDE per (Doc. #21 ) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aradaya LLC, Douglas M Wood, Thea M Wood. (EJA) Modified on 4/11/2024 (EJA).
April 3, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P Palmer on behalf of Thea M Wood. (Palmer, Adam)
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P Palmer on behalf of Douglas M Wood. (Palmer, Adam)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam P Palmer on behalf of Aradaya LLC. (Palmer, Adam)
April 2, 2024 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Alisha Drumm against Aradya, LLC, Douglas Wood, Thea Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default)(Bailey, Ryan)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff apply for entry of default or file a status report as to Defendants Aradaya LLC, Douglas M. Wood and Thea M. Wood within seven days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice as to Defendants Aradaya LLC, Douglas M. Wood and Thea M. Wood if counsel fails to apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/2/2024. (JAMA)
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alisha Drumm: Acceptance of Service re: Complaint & Summons upon Aradaya LLC, Douglas M. Wood, Thea M. Wood on March 1, 2024. (Bailey, Ryan)
March 1, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alisha Drumm.(Bailey, Ryan)
February 21, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Douglas M Wood, Thea M Wood. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Alisha Drumm. (Bailey, Ryan)
February 16, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aradaya LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/15/2024. (JAMA)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 15, 2024. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/15/2024. (JAMA)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Alisha Drumm. (Bailey, Ryan)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted. Incorrectly completed summons attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected summonses, as to each individual Defendant, that lists the complete return of service address for Plaintiff using the Summons Submitted event. As soon as the Court receives the corrected summons, they will be issued on the following business day. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22755056. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-00316-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Alisha Drumm. (Bailey, Ryan) (DXD)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22755056 filed by Alisha Drumm. (Bailey, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drumm v. Aradaya LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alisha Drumm
Represented By: Richard W Noel
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aradaya LLC
Represented By: Adam P Palmer
Represented By: Jett Taylor Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas M Wood
Represented By: Adam P Palmer
Represented By: Jett Taylor Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thea M Wood
Represented By: Adam P Palmer
Represented By: Jett Taylor Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?